Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2381867
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
02.08.2013 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
04.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2012 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
01.06.2012 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
01.06.2012 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
25.05.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.03.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.03.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] |
06.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
30.09.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
03.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|