Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011295199 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB54995 | 10.11.2009 | US14113008 | 29.12.2008 | US200913142456 | 10.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2381867 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB54995 | 10.11.2009 | US14113008 | 29.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102264313 | 30.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB54995 | 10.11.2009 | US14113008 | 29.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010076674 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14113008 | 29.12.2008 |