EP2349767 - FLYWHEEL MODULE AS WELL AS METHOD FOR ENERGY STORAGE AND DELIVERY IN THE FLYWHEEL MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drivetrain Innovations B.V. Croy 46 5653 LD Eindhoven / NL | [2015/52] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Drivetrain Innovations B.v. Croy 46 5653 LD Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DRUTEN, Roëll Marie Woenselsemarkt 30c NL-5612 CR Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VROEMEN, Bas Gerard Melkweg 51 NL-5642 CP Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
SERRARENS, Alexander Franciscus Anita Adriaan van Ostadelaan 7 NL-5581 JS Waalre / NL | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
VAN DRUTEN, Roëll Marie Woenselsemarkt 30c NL-5612 CR Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
VROEMEN, Bas Gerard Hagenkampweg Zuid 202 NL-5615 DB Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
SERRARENS, Alexander Franciscus Anita Adriaan van Ostadelaan 7 NL-5581 JS Waalre / NL | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | Verhees, Godefridus Josephus Maria Brabants Octrooibureau B.V. De Pinckart 54 5674 CC Nuenen / NL | ||
Former [2011/31] | Verhees, Godefridus Josephus Maria Brabants Octrooibureau B.V. De Pinckart 54 5674 CC Nuenen / NL | Application number, filing date | 09760640.4 | 21.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009NL50636 | Priority number, date | NL20082002122 | 21.10.2008 Original published format: NL 2002122 | [2011/31] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010059041 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2349767 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2349767 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/30, B60K6/365, B60K6/40, B60K6/48, B60K6/50, B60K6/10 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
B60K6/105 (EP,US);
B60K6/00 (KR);
B60K6/10 (KR);
B60K6/30 (EP,KR,US);
B60K6/36 (KR);
B60K6/445 (KR);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60K6/52 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60L15/2009 (EP,US);
B60L50/30 (EP,US);
B60L50/60 (EP,US);
B60L7/18 (EP,US);
B60K2006/4833 (EP);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/486 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2117 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWUNGRADMODUL SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR ENERGIESPEICHERUNG UND ABGABE IN DEM SCHWUNGRADMODUL | [2011/31] | English: | FLYWHEEL MODULE AS WELL AS METHOD FOR ENERGY STORAGE AND DELIVERY IN THE FLYWHEEL MODULE | [2011/31] | French: | MODULE DE VOLANT D'INERTIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE ET DE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE DANS LE VOLANT D'INERTIE | [2015/24] |
Former [2011/31] | MODULE DE VOLANT D INERTIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE ET DE TRANSFERT D ÉNERGIE DANS LE VOLANT D INERTIE | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2009 | AT | 23.12.2015 | BG | 23.12.2015 | CY | 23.12.2015 | CZ | 23.12.2015 | DK | 23.12.2015 | EE | 23.12.2015 | ES | 23.12.2015 | FI | 23.12.2015 | HR | 23.12.2015 | LT | 23.12.2015 | LV | 23.12.2015 | MC | 23.12.2015 | MK | 23.12.2015 | NL | 23.12.2015 | PL | 23.12.2015 | RO | 23.12.2015 | SE | 23.12.2015 | SI | 23.12.2015 | SK | 23.12.2015 | SM | 23.12.2015 | TR | 23.12.2015 | NO | 23.03.2016 | GR | 24.03.2016 | IS | 23.04.2016 | PT | 26.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 21.10.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.10.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.10.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 23.12.2015 | |
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 23.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]NL1022092C (DRUTEN ROELL MARIE VAN [NL], et al) [A] 1-19 * figure 13 *; | [A]WO2006043812 (DTI GROEP B V [NL], et al) [A] 1-19* page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 16 *; | [XAI]US2007049443 (SCHMIDT MICHAEL R [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10,12-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * [A] 3,6-8 [I] 11,16-19; | [XP]WO2009010819 (RENAULT TRUCKS [FR], et al) [XP] 1-4,9,10,12,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2007049443 | WO2009010819 |