EP2367648 - LADLE PIPE FOR LIQUID METAL CASTING PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vesuvius Group S.A Rue de Douvrain, 17 7011 Ghlin / BE | [2011/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLURA, Mariano Rue Harmegnies 63 B-7110 Strépy-Bracquegnies / BE | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Debled, Thierry Vesuvius Group S.A. Intellectual Property Department Rue de Douvrain, 17 7011 Ghlin / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Debled, Thierry Vesuvius Group S.A. Intellectual Property Department Rue de Douvrain, 17 7011 Ghlin / BE | Application number, filing date | 09760743.6 | 19.11.2009 | WO2009EP08243 | Priority number, date | EP20080169499 | 20.11.2008 Original published format: EP 08169499 | [2011/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010057639 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2367648 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2367648 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/106, B22D41/50 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
B22D41/50 (EP,KR,US);
B22D11/106 (EP,KR,US);
B22D11/04 (KR);
B22D11/10 (KR);
B22D41/22 (KR);
B22D41/24 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | RS | 20.06.2011 | Title | German: | GIESSPFANNENROHR FÜR FLÜSSIGMETALLGUSSANLAGE | [2011/39] | English: | LADLE PIPE FOR LIQUID METAL CASTING PLANT | [2011/39] | French: | TUBE DE POCHE POUR INSTALLATION DE COULEE DE METAL LIQUIDE | [2011/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 16.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.01.2013 | EE | 02.01.2013 | HR | 02.01.2013 | LT | 02.01.2013 | LV | 02.01.2013 | MC | 02.01.2013 | MT | 02.01.2013 | SM | 02.01.2013 | IS | 02.05.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/24] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
SM | 02.01.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 02.01.2013 | |
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | HR | 02.01.2013 | |
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 02.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2004052576 (VESUVIUS GROUP SA [BE], et al) [AD] 1-7 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * figures 1-4; claims 1-10 *; | [A]US4892235 (KING PATRICK D [US]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-6; claims 1-3 *; | [A]FR2694711 (DAUSSAN & CO [FR]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-7; claims 1-7 *; | [A]JPH09108825 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO, et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]JPH07164117 (KUROSAKI REFRACTORIES CO) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]EP0858851 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-20; claims 1-11 *; | [A]GB2171348 (STOPINC AG) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-6; claims 1-8 *; | [A]US4593838 (OBERBACH MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-6; claims 1-13 *; | [A]US4316561 (GROSKO JOHN A) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-10; claims 1-18 * |