EP2306923 - DENTURES, DENTAL ARCHES AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accentu8 Novotecnica Pty Ltd 907 High Street Thornbury, Victoria 3071 / AU | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGGIO, Sebastian 907 High Street Thornbury Victoria 3071 / AU | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Simon, Josef, et al Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Simon, Josef, et al Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09761167.7 | 11.06.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009AU00731 | Priority number, date | AU20080902951 | 11.06.2008 Original published format: AU 2008902951 | AU20080906576 | 22.12.2008 Original published format: AU 2008906576 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009149502 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2306923 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/01, A61C13/36, A61C13/38, A61C19/04 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
A61C13/01 (EP,US);
A61C13/1016 (EP,US);
A61C13/12 (EP,US);
A61C19/04 (EP,US);
A61C9/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/15] | Extension states | AL | 29.12.2010 | BA | 29.12.2010 | RS | 29.12.2010 | Title | German: | ZAHNERSATZ, ZAHNBÖGEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2011/15] | English: | DENTURES, DENTAL ARCHES AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE | [2011/15] | French: | PROTHÈSES DENTAIRES, ARCS DENTAIRES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 29.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/26] | 27.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007137379 (UNICAMP [BR], et al); | [X]US6139321 (MACCULLOCH WILLIAM THOMSON [IE]); | [X]US5049075 (BARRUT LUC [DE]); | [X]US2006084024 (FARRELL CHRISTOPHER J [AU]); | [X]US3916526 (SCHUDY FRED FRANK); | [X]US5718584 (WONG NELSON J [US]); | [X]US4202098 (RUSSO LEONARD [US]); | [X]WO2008039544 (DENTSPLY INT INC [US], et al) |