EP2288876 - POSITION MEASURING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TR Electronic GmbH Eglishalde 6 78647 Trossingen / DE | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZ, Ulrich 20 Brucknerweg 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt Weiß, Arat & Partner mbB Zeppelinstraße 4 78234 Engen / DE | [2017/37] |
Former [2011/09] | Weiss, Peter, et al Dr. Weiss & Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09761387.1 | 26.05.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009EP03720 | Priority number, date | DE20081027400 | 09.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008027400 | DE20091020205 | 07.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009020205 | [2011/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009149824 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2288876 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2288876 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/347, G01D11/30 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
G01D5/34746 (EP);
G01D11/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/37] |
Former [2011/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POSITIONSMESSSYSTEM | [2011/09] | English: | POSITION MEASURING SYSTEM | [2011/09] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MESURE DE POSITION | [2011/09] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 25.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.2013 | 31.05.2016 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.09.2017 | CZ | 13.09.2017 | DK | 13.09.2017 | EE | 13.09.2017 | ES | 13.09.2017 | FI | 13.09.2017 | HR | 13.09.2017 | LT | 13.09.2017 | LV | 13.09.2017 | MC | 13.09.2017 | MK | 13.09.2017 | MT | 13.09.2017 | NL | 13.09.2017 | PL | 13.09.2017 | PT | 13.09.2017 | RO | 13.09.2017 | SE | 13.09.2017 | SI | 13.09.2017 | SK | 13.09.2017 | TR | 13.09.2017 | BG | 13.12.2017 | NO | 13.12.2017 | GR | 14.12.2017 | IS | 13.01.2018 | AT | 26.05.2018 | GB | 26.05.2018 | IE | 26.05.2018 | LU | 26.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | FR | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
AT | 26.05.2018 | ||
GB | 26.05.2018 | ||
IE | 26.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
AT | 26.05.2018 | ||
GB | 26.05.2018 | ||
IE | 26.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
AT | 26.05.2018 | ||
GB | 26.05.2018 | ||
IE | 26.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
GB | 26.05.2018 | ||
IE | 26.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
GB | 26.05.2018 | ||
IE | 26.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 26.05.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 26.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 13.09.2017 | |
NO | 13.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [DXY]DE10338265 (BALLUFF GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0025] - [0104] - [0115]; figures 2,6,8 * [Y] 2-14; | [X]DE4306539 (FESTO KG [DE]) [X] 1,15 * columns 1,7 *; | [X]DE19812965 (ELMEG [DE]) [X] 1,15 * figure 7 *; | [Y]US2002100182 (SAKURAI KOJI [JP]) [Y] 2-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE202004010812U (DEMAG ERGOTECH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2-14 * the whole document * |