EP2300886 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE SIMPLIFIED OPERATION AND MANIPULATION OF AN AUTOMATION AND/OR PROCESS CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLLENDER, Martin Am Rebgarten 50 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 02 /
HUSOY, Kristoffer Ringgata 2E N-0577 Oslo / NO | 03 /
GRAVEN, Tone-Grete Blommenholmveien 27 N-1365 Blommenholm / NO | [2011/23] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
HOLLENDER, Martin Am Rebgarten 50 69221 Dossenheim / DE | ||
02 /
HUSOY, Kristoffer Ringgata 2E N-0577 Oslo / NO | |||
03 /
GRAVEN, Tone-Grete Lagveien 62 N-1540 Nesoddtangen / NO | Representative(s) | Miller, Toivo ABB AG GF-IP Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Miller, Toivo ABB AG GF-IP Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09761499.4 | 12.06.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009EP04215 | Priority number, date | DE20081027834 | 11.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008027834 | [2011/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009149936 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2300886 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G05B19/418, G06F17/30, H04L12/24 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
G05B23/0272 (EP,US);
G05B2219/14005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VEREINFACHTEN BEDIENUNG SOWIE HANDHABUNG EINES AUTOMATISIERUNGS- UND/ODER PROZESSLEITSYSTEMS | [2011/13] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE SIMPLIFIED OPERATION AND MANIPULATION OF AN AUTOMATION AND/OR PROCESS CONTROL SYSTEM | [2011/13] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SIMPLIFIER LA COMMANDE ET LA MANIPULATION D'UN SYSTÈME D'AUTOMATISATION ET/OU DE CONTRÔLE DE PROCESSUS | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 04.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 09.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004027531 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 1, line 6 - line 9 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 34 * * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 9 *; | [X]EP1727009 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0002]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0076] *; | [X]US2006273892 (OKADA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008]; figures 1,2,4,5 * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] *; | [X]US2007268122 (KOW YONG MING [SG], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1,4 * |