22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
08.05.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
30.05.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
27.05.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.05.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.05.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.11.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.07.2012 |
First examination report |
|
24.07.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] |
10.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
22.02.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.01.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] |
28.01.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] |
18.01.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|