Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101280688B | Global Dossier | 01.07.2013 | B1 | KR20110007240 | 21.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP56986 | 08.06.2009 | EP08158075 | 11.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5329656B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | B2 | JP2011522854 | 04.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP56986 | 08.06.2009 | EP08158075 | 11.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009256679 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP56986 | 08.06.2009 | EP08158075 | 11.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2288594 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2014 | B1 | EP2288594 | 02.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP56986 | 08.06.2009 | EP09761672 | 08.06.2009 | EP08158075 | 11.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0913597 | 24.11.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP56986 | 08.06.2009 | EP08158075 | 11.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2725654 | 17.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP56986 | 08.06.2009 | EP08158075 | 11.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102056902B | 07.08.2013 | B | CN102056902 | 11.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP56986 | 08.06.2009 | EP08158075 | 11.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2498740T | 25.09.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP56986 | 08.06.2009 | EP08158075 | 11.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2010012896 | 21.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP56986 | 08.06.2009 | EP08158075 | 11.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009150109 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08158075 | 11.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8063088 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2011 | B2 | US2009312382 | 17.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08158075 | 11.06.2008 |