EP2295932 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techno Dream 21 Co., Ltd. No. 101, 1-10-13, Ryoke Urawa-ku Saitama-shi Saitama, 330-0072 / JP | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWASAKI, Hiroshi 408, 10-19-42 Tokiwa Urawa-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 330-0061 / JP | 02 /
FURUKAWA, Ryo 805, 6-8-1 Ozuka-nishi Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-3167 / JP | 03 /
SAGAWA, Ryusuke 8-1 Mihogaoka Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0047 / JP | 04 /
YAGI, Yasushi 8-1 Mihogaoka Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0047 / JP | [2014/41] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
KAWASAKI, Hiroshi 408, 10-19-42 Tokiwa Urawa-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 330-0061 / JP | ||
02 /
FURUKAWA, Ryo 805, 6-8-1 Ozuka-nishi Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-3167 / JP | |||
03 /
SAGAWA, Ryusuke 8-1 Mihogaoka Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0047 / JP | |||
04 /
YAGI, Yasushi 8-1 Mihogaoka Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0047 / JP | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2014/41] |
Former [2011/11] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 09762230.2 | 04.06.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009JP02511 | Priority number, date | JP20080155605 | 13.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008155605 | [2011/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009150799 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2295932 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2295932 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G01B11/25, G06T1/00, G06T17/00 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
G01B11/25 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (EP,US);
G06T7/521 (EP,US);
G06T2200/08 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10028 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/11] | G01B11/25, G06T1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2011/11] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2011/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D IMAGES, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D IMAGES ET PROGRAMME | [2011/11] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2011 | Translation filed | 11.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 25.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2009 | AT | 08.10.2014 | BE | 08.10.2014 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | ES | 08.10.2014 | FI | 08.10.2014 | HR | 08.10.2014 | IT | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | MK | 08.10.2014 | MT | 08.10.2014 | NL | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | SE | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | NO | 08.01.2015 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | IE | 04.06.2015 | LU | 04.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/46] | HU | 04.06.2009 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 04.06.2015 | ||
LU | 04.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 04.06.2009 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 04.06.2015 | ||
LU | 04.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 04.06.2015 | ||
LU | 04.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 04.06.2015 | ||
LU | 04.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 04.06.2015 | ||
LU | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 08.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID] - HIROSHI KAWASAKI ET AL, "Dense 3D Reconstruction method using Coplanarities and Metric Constraints for Line Laser Scanning", 3-D DIGITAL IMAGING AND MODELING, 2007. 3DIM '07. SIXTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070801), ISBN 978-0-7695-2939-4, pages 149 - 158, XP031130991 [ID] 1-4,10-15 * pages 2,4 - page 5; figures 3-6 * | [A] - RYO FURUKAWA ET AL, "Self-Calibration of Multiple Laser Planes for 3D Scene Reconstruction", 3D DATA PROCESSING, VISUALIZATION, AND TRANSMISSION, THIRD INTERNATION AL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PI, (20060601), ISBN 978-0-7695-2825-0, pages 200 - 207, XP031078942 [A] 1-4,10-15 * page 2 - page 6; figures 1-4 * | [XP] - HIROSHI KAWASAKI H ET AL, "Dynamic scene shape reconstruction using a single structured light pattern", COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2008. CVPR 2008. IEEE CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080623), ISBN 978-1-4244-2242-5, pages 1 - 8, XP031297260 [XP] 1-5,7-9,13-15 * the whole document * | [A] - HIROSHI KAWASAKI ET AL, Shape Reconstruction from Cast Shadows Using Coplanarities and Metric Constraints, COMPUTER VISION Â ACCV 2007; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 847 - 857, (20071118), ISBN 978-3-540-76389-5, XP019082533 [A] 1,14,15 * page 850 - page 852; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPS6344107 (MATSUMOTO GORO, et al); | [A]JP2000512012 (K.U. LEUVEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT) | [A] - HIROSHI KAWASAKI ET AL., "Fukusu Laser Heimen no Jiko Kosei ni yoru 3D Saikosei", THE TRANSACTIONS OF THE IEICE, D, (20070801), vol. J90-D, no. 8, pages 1848 - 1857, XP008140610 | by applicant | - S. INOKUCHI; K. SATO; F. MATSUDA, "Range imaging system for 3-D object recognition", ICPR, (1984), vol. 2, pages 806 - 808 | - C. JE; S. W. LEE; AND R.-H. PARK, "High-Contrast Color-stripe pattern for rapid structured-light range imaging", ECCV, (2004), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 95 - 107 | - J. PAN; P. S. HUANG; F.-P. CHIANG, "Color-coded binary fringe projection technique for 3-d shape measurement", OPTICAL ENGINEERING, (2005), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 23606 - 23615 | - J. SALVI; J. BATLLE; E. M. MOUADDIB, "A robust-coded pattern projection for dynamic 3d scene measurement", PATTERN RECOGNITION, (1998), vol. 19, no. 11, pages 1055 - 1065 | - S. RUSINKEIWICZ, "Real-time 3D model acquisition", ACM SIGGRAPH, (2002), pages 438 - 446 | - O. HALL-HOLT; S. RUSINKIEWICZ, "Stripe boundary codes for real-time structured-light range scanning of moving objects", ICCV, (2001), vol. 2, pages 359 - 366 | - L. ZHANG; N. SNAVELY; B. CURLESS; S.M. SEITZ, "Spacetime faces: High-resolution capture for modeling and animation", ACM ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER GRAPHICS, (20040802), pages 548 - 558 | - T. P. KONINCKX; L. V. GOOL., "Real-time range acquisition by adaptive structured light", IEEE TRANS. ON PAMI, (200603), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 432 - 445 | - RYO FURUKAWA; HIROSHI KAWASAKI, "Dense 3D Reconstruction with an Uncalibrated Stereo System using Coded Structured Light", IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR'05) WORKSHOP ON PROJECTOR-CAMERA SYSTEMS, (2005), page 107 |