EP2314392 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING HIGH-ALLOY SEAMLESS PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2013/04] |
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Sumitomo Metal Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI Hiroaki c/o Sumitomo Metal Industries Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 02 /
YAMAKAWA Tomio c/o Sumitomo Metal Industries Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 03 /
DOUHARA Tadashi c/o Sumitomo Metal Industries Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 04 /
SAGARA Masayuki c/o Sumitomo Metal Industries Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2016/32] |
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
MURAKAMI Hiroaki c/o Sumitomo Metal Industries Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMAKAWA Tomio c/o Sumitomo Metal Industries Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | |||
03 /
DOUHARA Tadashi c/o Sumitomo Metal Industries Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | |||
04 /
SAGARA Masayuki c/o Sumitomo Metal Industries Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2016/32] |
Former [2011/17] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/17] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstrasse 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09762419.1 | 04.06.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009JP60229 | Priority number, date | JP20080155808 | 13.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008155808 | [2011/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009150989 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2314392 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2314392 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B21C23/08, C21D8/10, C22C19/05, C22C38/00, C22C38/40, C22C38/58, C22F1/00, C22F1/10, C21D9/08, C21D9/14, C22C38/42, C22C38/44 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
C21D8/10 (EP,US);
B21C23/085 (EP,US);
B21C25/02 (EP,US);
C21D6/001 (EP,US);
C21D6/002 (EP,US);
C21D9/08 (EP,US);
C21D9/14 (EP,US);
C22C19/05 (EP,US);
C22C19/055 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/17] | B21C23/08, C21D8/10, C22C19/05, C22C38/00, C22C38/40, C22C38/58, C22F1/00, C22F1/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2011/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HOCHLEGIERTEN NAHTLOSEN ROHRS | [2011/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING HIGH-ALLOY SEAMLESS PIPE | [2011/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE TUYAU SANS SOUDURE FORTEMENT ALLIÉ | [2011/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2010 | Translation filed | 20.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 02.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2009 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | NO | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 04.06.2009 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 04.06.2009 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.06.2009 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2127767 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [E] 1,7,8 * claims 1,6 *; | [A]US4421571 (KUDO TAKEO [JP], et al) [A] 1,7 * table 9 * | International search | [A]JP2004174536 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [A]JPH05261427 (SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.); | [A]JPH11302801 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) | by applicant | JPH11302801 | JPS586927 | JPS63274743 |