EP2304874 - DITHERING A DIGITALLY-CONTROLLED OSCILLATOR OUTPUT IN A PHASE-LOCKED LOOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALLANTYNE, Gary, John 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09763397.8 | 08.06.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009US46643 | Priority number, date | US20080136690 | 10.06.2008 Original published format: US 136690 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009152106 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2304874 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/099, H03L7/085, H03C3/09 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
H03L7/099 (EP,KR,US);
H03C3/09 (KR);
H03L7/085 (KR);
H03L2207/50 (EP,US);
H04B1/69 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | DITHERN DER AUSGABE EINES DIGITAL GESTEUERTEN OSZILLATORS IN EINEM PHASENREGELKREIS | [2011/14] | English: | DITHERING A DIGITALLY-CONTROLLED OSCILLATOR OUTPUT IN A PHASE-LOCKED LOOP | [2011/14] | French: | TREMBLOTEMENT DE LA SORTIE D'UN OSCILLATEUR À COMMANDE NUMÉRIQUE DANS UNE BOUCLE À VERROUILLAGE DE PHASE | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 11.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 02.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2002033737 (STASZEWSKI ROBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9-13,15-17,19-21 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0087] * * figures 3,18,19 * [I] 6,8,14,18; | [XI]EP1255355 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7,9-13,15-17,19-21 * column 8, line 52 - line 56 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 2,3,18,19 * [I] 6,8,14,18; | [A] - BARONTI F ET AL, "A technique for nonlinearity self-calibration of DLLs", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20030801), vol. 52, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9456, pages 1255 - 1260, XP011101118 [A] 8,14 * page 1256, paragraph II; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIM.2003.816814 | by applicant | US2002033737 | EP1255355 |