EP2285290 - TISSUE RETAINING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Children's Mercy Hospital 2401 Gillham Road Kansas City, MO 64108 / US | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOPKINS, Richard, A. 2401 Gillham Road Kansas City MO 64108 / US | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Kalhammer, Georg, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Kalhammer, Georg, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09763464.6 | 09.06.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009US46781 | Priority number, date | US20080060017P | 09.06.2008 Original published format: US 60017 P | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009152174 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2285290 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/11, C12M3/00, A61F2/06, A61B17/04, C12M1/00 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
A61B17/11 (EP,US);
A61F2/064 (EP,US);
C12M21/08 (EP,US);
C12M23/46 (EP,US);
C12M29/10 (EP,US);
A61B17/04 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1107 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/08] | A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | GEWEBEHALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2011/08] | English: | TISSUE RETAINING SYSTEM | [2011/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MAINTIEN DES TISSUS | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 29.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 07.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5792603 (DUNKELMANET AL.) [X] 16-20 * figures 1,6 * * column 1, line 13 - line 18 * * column 2, line 38 - line 40 * * column 2, line 57 - line 60 * * column 6, line 19 - line 40 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]US5267983 (OILSCHLAGER ET AL.) [Y] 1-15 * figure 2 * * column 1, line 5 - line 9 * * column 1, line 29 - line 35 * * column 2, line 55 - line 56 * * column 3, line 15 - line 18 *; | [Y]US4693707 (DYE) [Y] 1-15 * figures 2,3 * * column 1, line 10 - line 13 * * page 3, line 25 - line 27 *; | [Y]US5776117 (HASELHORST ET AL.) [Y] 1-15 * figure 2 * * column 1, line 10 - line 13 * * column 3, line 25 - line 27 *; | [Y]US6537567 (NIKLASON ET AL.) [Y] 10-15 * figures 4,5 * * column 2, line 8 - line 20 * * column 6, line 34 - line 44 *; | [Y]US6416995 (WOLFINBARGER) [Y] 10-15 * figure 7 * * column 9, line 46 - line 55 *; | [Y]DE20207617U (BIONICOR GMBH) [Y] 10-15 * figure 1; claims 1-5, 7, 8 *; | [Y]US2005245899 (SWISHER) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0002]; figures 2,3,5,7 *; | [A]US2007050013 (GROSS) [A] 16-20 * paragraphs [0002] , [0026] - [0031]; figures 12A, 12B, 12C, 13, 14A, 14B *; | [A]EP1275344 (BIORING SA) [A] 1-20 * figures 1,5a * * paragraphs [0001] , [0016] , [0020] , [0022] , [0023] , [0031] - [0034] * | International search | [X]US6030395 (NASH ET AL); | [X]US2008132924 (MCGUCKIN); | [Y]US6234188 (MOORE JR); | [A]US2002115208 (MITCHELL ET AL); | [A]US2005137614 (PORTER ET AL) |