EP2296701 - CELL-BASED SYSTEMS FOR PRODUCING INFLUENZA VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flugen, Inc. 545 Science Drive Madison, WI 53711 / US | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILSEL, Pamuk 9 Boothbay Circle Madison, WI 83717 / US | 02 /
KAWAOKA, Yoshihiro 8722 Airport Drive Middleton, WI 53562 / US | 03 /
NEUMANN, Gabriele 234 Randolph Drive, apt. 316 Madison, WI 53717 / US | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Bentham, Andrew J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09763471.1 | 09.06.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009US46792 | Priority number, date | US20080060653P | 11.06.2008 Original published format: US 60653 P | US20090169548P | 15.04.2009 Original published format: US 169548 P | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009152181 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2296701 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/145, C12N7/00, C12N5/10 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
A61K39/145 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/16 (EP);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16034 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16051 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16134 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16151 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16234 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | ZELLBASIERTE SYSTEME ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GRIPPEIMPFSTOFFEN | [2011/12] | English: | CELL-BASED SYSTEMS FOR PRODUCING INFLUENZA VACCINES | [2011/12] | French: | SYSTÈMES À BASE DE CELLULES POUR PRODUIRE DES VACCINS CONTRE LA GRIPPE | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 14.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/08] | 02.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1103610 (INTROGENE BV [NL]) [X] 16,17 * claims 1,19,30 *; | [Y]WO2007110776 (NOVARTIS VACCINES & DIAGNOSTIC [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5,12-15 * page 1, lines 4,5 * * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 4 * * claims 1,33,34 *; | [XY] - ZHANG X ET AL, "Stable expression of human alpha-2,6-sialyltransferase in Chinese hamster ovary cells: functional consequences for human erythropoietin expression and bioactivity", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA - GENERAL SUBJECTS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (19981127), vol. 1425, no. 3, ISSN 0304-4165, pages 441 - 452, XP004276231 [X] 6-11 * page 441 * * abstract * * page 447, column L, paragraph 2 * [Y] 1-5,12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-4165(98)00095-6 | [DXY] - LEE E U ET AL, "ALTERATION OF TERMINAL GLYCOSYLATION SEQUENCES ON N-LINKED OLIGOSACCHARIDES OF CHINESE HAMSTER OVARY CELLS BY EXPRESSION OF BETA GALACTOSIDE ALPHA-2 6-SIALYLTRANSFERASE", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 264, no. 23, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 13848 - 13855, XP002915039 [DX] 6-11 * page 13848 * * abstract * * page 13848, column R, paragraph L - page 13849, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 13852; figure 6 * [Y] 1-5,12-15 | [DXY] - MATROSOVICH M ET AL, "Overexpression of the [alpha]-2,6-sialyltransferase in MDCK cells increases influenza virus sensitivity to neuraminidase inhibitors", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY 200308 US, (200308), vol. 77, no. 15, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 8418 - 8425, XP002551286 [DX] 16,17 * page 8418, column R, paragraph 1 - page 8419, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 8420, column L, paragraph 2 - page 8421, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 8423, paragraph 3 * [Y] 1-5,12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.77.15.8418-8425.2003 | [DXY] - HATAKEYAMA S ET AL, "Enhanced expression of an [alpha]2,6-linked sialic acid on MDCK cells improves isolation of human influenza viruses and evaluation of their sensitivity to a neuraminidase inhibitor", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY 200508 US, (200508), vol. 43, no. 8, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 4139 - 4146, XP002551287 [DX] 16,17 * page 4139, column L, paragraph 1 - page 4140, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 4141, column L, paragraph 1 - page 4143, column L, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-5,12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.43.8.4139-4146.2005 | [A] - KUMARI KSHAMA ET AL, "Receptor binding specificity of recent human H3N2 influenza viruses", VIROLOGY JOURNAL, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20070509), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 1743-422X, page 42, XP021025487 [A] * page 1 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1743-422X-4-42 |