EP2300495 - Methods for preparing decellularised tissue for recellularisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/13] | SOLUTIONS FOR TISSUE ENGINEERING AND METHODS OF USE | ||
[2016/44] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Children's Mercy Hospital 2401 Gillham Road Kansas City, MO 64108 / US | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOPKINS, Richard 2401 Gillham Road Kansas City MO 64108 / US | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | Kalhammer, Georg Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Kalhammer, Georg Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09763672.4 | 11.06.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009US47115 | Priority number, date | US20080060790P | 11.06.2008 Original published format: US 60790 P | US20080060796P | 11.06.2008 Original published format: US 60796 P | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009152384 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2300495 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/36, A61F2/24 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
A61L27/3695 (EP,US);
A61L27/3604 (EP,US);
C12N5/0068 (EP,US);
A61L2430/40 (EP,US);
C12N2521/00 (EP,US);
C12N2533/90 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/13] | C07K14/495, A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von zellfreiem Gewebe für Gewebemanipulation | [2016/44] | English: | Methods for preparing decellularised tissue for recellularisation | [2016/44] | French: | Procédé pour la production du tissu sans cellules pour la culture de tissus | [2016/44] |
Former [2011/13] | LÖSUNGEN FÜR DIE GEWEBEMANIPULATION UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2011/13] | SOLUTIONS FOR TISSUE ENGINEERING AND METHODS OF USE | ||
Former [2011/13] | SOLUTIONS UTILISABLES EN INGÉNIERIE TISSULAIRE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 26.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/35] | 12.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2005118014 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]; UEDA YUICHIRO [US]; TORRIANNI MARK W [US]; EVERAER) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007218038 (NATARAJ CHANDRASEKARAN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A] - KETCHEDJIAN A ET AL, "Recellularization of Decellularized Allograft Scaffolds in Ovine Great Vessel Reconstructions", THE ANNALS OF THORACIC SURGERY, ELSEVIER, (20050301), vol. 79, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.ATHORACSUR.2004.09.033, ISSN 0003-4975, pages 888 - 896, XP004761944 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.athoracsur.2004.09.033 | [A] - PATHAK CHANDRASHEKAR P ET AL, "Treatment of bioprosthetic heart valve tissue with long chain alcohol solution to lower calcification potential.", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH, (20040401), vol. 69A, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9304, pages 140 - 144, XP002639448 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHMIDT C E ET AL, "Acellular vascular tissues: natural biomaterials for tissue repair and tissue engineering", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (20001115), vol. 21, no. 22, doi:10.1016/S0142-9612(00)00148-4, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 2215 - 2231, XP004210279 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(00)00148-4 | International search | [X]US2007020248 (EVERAERTS FRANK J L [NL], et al); | [X]US2007239066 (LAHAM ROGER J [US], et al); | [Y]US2002177223 (OGLE MATHEW F [US], et al); | [Y]US2004059430 (KIM TAE-WOON [KR], et al); | [Y]US2007254005 (PATHAK CHANDRASKEKHAR P [US], et al); | [Y]US2007276507 (BERTRAM TIMOTHY A [US], et al); | [Y]US6242573 (GOTO MASAOKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2007141100 (SUNG HSING-WEN [TW], et al); | [Y]US7078163 (TORRIANNI MARK W [US]); | [Y]US3551560 (THIELE HEINRICH F); | [Y]US2006154367 (KIHM ANTHONY J [US], et al); | [Y]US2005119736 (ZILLA PETER [ZA], et al); | [Y]US6479064 (ATALA ANTHONY [US]); | [Y]US2007276037 (WOO YI-PING J [US]); | [Y]US2007197890 (BOOCK ROBERT [US], et al); | [Y]US2008004713 (NAKAMURA NORIMASA [JP], et al); | [Y]US2008095757 (LEVIN NEIL [US]); | [Y]US2006210960 (LIVESEY STEPHEN A [AU], et al); | [Y]US2007105222 (WOLFINBARGER LLOYD [US], et al); | [Y]US2006253192 (ATALA ANTHONY [US], et al) | by applicant | US2007020248 |