24.11.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
22.08.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.02.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
28.09.2016 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
16.09.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
16.09.2016 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
13.09.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.07.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.04.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.12.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.11.2015 |
First examination report |
|
03.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.03.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.08.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
25.07.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] |
25.07.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] |
17.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
23.08.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
23.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.07.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
31.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.07.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.08.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
15.07.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] |
01.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.03.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
04.03.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
14.02.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.01.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|