EP2303337 - SMALL MOLECULE LIGAND-DRUG CONJUGATES FOR TARGETED CANCER THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cedars-Sinai Medical Center 8700 Beverly Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US | For all designated states Emory University 1380 S. Oxford Road Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states Cedars-Sinai Medical Center 8700 Beverly Boulevard Los Angeles, California 90048 / US | ||
For all designated states Emory University 1380 S. Oxford Road Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNG, Leland, W., K. 1136 Clifton Road Atlanta GA 30307 / US | 02 /
YANG, Xiaojian 61 Building, 59 15 Changle West Road Xi'an, Shaanxi 710032 / CN | 03 /
CHENG, Jianjun 2304 Lynwood Drive Champaign IL 61821 / US | 04 /
TONG, Rong 100 Memorial Drive Apartment 8-20B Cambridge MA / US | [2011/33] |
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
CHUNG, Leland, W., K. 1136 Clifton Road Atlanta GA 30307 / US | ||
02 /
YANG, Xiaojian 5285 Village View Lane Stone Mountain GA 30087 / US | |||
03 /
CHENG, Jianjun 2304 Lynwood Drive Champaign IL 61821 / US | |||
04 /
TONG, Rong 510 East Michigan Avenue Urbana IL 61801 / US | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Holmes, Michael Anthony, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2011/14] | Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 09763728.4 | 12.06.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009US47216 | Priority number, date | US20080061346P | 13.06.2008 Original published format: US 61346 P | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009152440 | Date: | 17.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2303337 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/00, A61M36/14, A61K47/48 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
A61K49/0002 (EP,US);
A61K47/545 (EP,US);
A61K47/546 (EP,US);
A61K49/0032 (EP,US);
A61K49/0052 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/14] | A61K51/00, A61M36/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | KLEINMOLEKÜLIGE LIGANDEN-ARZNEIMITTEL-KONJUGATE FÜR DIE GEZIELTE KREBSTHERAPIE | [2011/14] | English: | SMALL MOLECULE LIGAND-DRUG CONJUGATES FOR TARGETED CANCER THERAPY | [2011/14] | French: | CONJUGUÉS MÉDICAMENT-LIGAND À PETITE MOLÉCULE POUR TRAITEMENT CIBLÉ CONTRE LE CANCER | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 02.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 23.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.09.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2012 | 30.06.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.08.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0238190 (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * Conjugates of pamidonate (a drug) and an indol-polyene molecule carrying a side chain portion, separated by a spacer. *; | [X]WO03032901 (MALLINCKRODT INC [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * Conjugates comprising a cyanidin moiety as defined in the claims, octreotide or octreotate (i.e. a drug) and possibly also a phorbate moiety i.e. a label: see claims, figure 1 and examples 4-8 *; | [X]WO03055935 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1-17 * Cyanin derivatives as defined in claims, conjugated by a spacer to folic acid, i.e. a drug (See figure 13 and example 9, on page 69). Other drugs, including paclitaxel can be included in the conjugate: see pages 29-31, claim 44. *; | [Y]EP1679082 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [Y] 1-17 * Cyanine compound for imaging, which is readily uptaken in tumoral tissues: see claims and paragraphs 11, 13, 42 *; | [Y] - SUN X ET AL, "Anticarcinoma activity of a novel drug, 3-ethyl-3'-methyl- thiatelluracarbocyanine iodide (Te), a tellurium-containing cyanine targeted at mitochondria", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH 199608 US, (199608), vol. 2, no. 8, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 1335 - 1340, XP002727407 [Y] 1-17 * See abstract and results: cyanine dyes accumulate in the mithochondria of carcinoma cells * | [T] - ZHANG ERLONG ET AL, "Mechanistic study of IR-780 dye as a potential tumor targeting and drug delivery agent.", BIOMATERIALS JAN 2014, (201401), vol. 35, no. 2, ISSN 1878-5905, pages 771 - 778, XP002727408 [T] * See abstract and page 777: IR-780, as drug targeting and drug delivery agent * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2013.10.033 | [T] - XIAO LI ET AL, "Heptamethine cyanine based (64)Cu-PET probe PC-1001 for cancer imaging: synthesis and in vivo evaluation.", NUCLEAR MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY APR 2013, (201304), vol. 40, no. 3, ISSN 1872-9614, pages 351 - 360, XP002727409 [T] * See abstract and passage bridging left and right hand column on page 359: small molecules as delivery agents * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nucmedbio.2013.01.001 | International search | [Y]US6191290 (SAFAVY AHMAD [US]); | [Y]US6214812 (KARPEISKY MARAT [US], et al); | [Y]US2004052727 (DALTON JAMES T [US], et al); | [Y]US2005255042 (LAM KIT S [US], et al); | [X]US2005281741 (ACHILEFU SAMUEL I [US], et al); | [Y]US2006292078 (KLAVENESS JO [NO], et al); | [A]US2007140962 (ACHILEFU SAMUEL [US], et al) | Examination | - SONG Y ET AL, "Conjugate of mitomycin C with N-succinyl-chitosan: In vitro drug release properties, toxicity and antitumor activity", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 98, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/0378-5173(93)90048-K, ISSN 0378-5173, (19930831), pages 121 - 130, (19930831), XP025565447 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(93)90048-K |