Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2347197 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2019 | B1 | EP2347197 | 27.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP64772 | 06.11.2009 | DE102008043653 | 11.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102209870 | 05.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP64772 | 06.11.2009 | DE102008043653 | 11.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2347197T | 30.08.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP64772 | 06.11.2009 | EP09763891 | 06.11.2009 | DE102008043653 | 11.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2516631 | 20.05.2014 | C2 | RU2011120274 | 20.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP64772 | 06.11.2009 | DE102008043653 | 11.11.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010054993 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008043653 | 11.11.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102008043653 | 20.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008043653 | 11.11.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR201901550T | 21.02.2019 | T4 | Priority number | Date | DE102008043653 | 11.11.2008 |