EP2347197 - SUCTION TUBE CONSTRUCTION, AN EVAPORATOR USING SUCH A SUCTION TUBE CONSTRUCTION AND A DOMESTIC REFRIGERATING DEVICE WITH THE SUCTION TUBE CONSTRUCTION OR WITH AN EVAPORATOR USING THE LATTER. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRITTNER, Gunter Leipheimer Str. 35 89233 Neu-Ulm / DE | 02 /
LAPCHENKO, Tetyana Schmittenbergstr. 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 03 /
MOCH, Holger Wendelsteinweg 14 89537 Giengen / DE | 04 /
PFLOMM, Berthold Neunkirchenweg 56 89077 Ulm / DE | 05 /
WOLDENBERG, Walter Fuchssteige 5 89428 Syrgenstein / DE | [2011/39] |
Former [2011/30] | 01 /
GRITTNER, Gunter Leipheimer Str. 35 89233 Neu-Ulm / DE | ||
02 /
LAPCHENKO, Tetyana Heidenheimer Str. 43 89520 Heidenheim / DE | |||
03 /
MOCH, Holger Wendelsteinweg 14 89537 Giengen / DE | |||
04 /
PFLOMM, Berthold Neunkirchenweg 56 89077 Ulm / DE | |||
05 /
WOLDENBERG, Walter Fuchssteige 5 89428 Syrgenstein / DE | Application number, filing date | 09763891.0 | 06.11.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009EP64772 | Priority number, date | DE20081043653 | 11.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008043653 | [2011/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010054993 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2347197 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2347197 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/06, F28F19/04 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
F28D7/0008 (EP,US);
F25B41/37 (EP,US);
F28F19/04 (EP);
F25B2400/052 (EP);
F25B39/024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2011/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAUG-DROSSELROHRAUFBAU, EINEN DIESEN VERWENDENDER VERDAMPFER UND EIN HAUSHALTSKÄLTEGERÄT MIT DEM SAUG-DROSSELROHRAUFBAU BZW. MIT EINEM DIESEN VERWENDENDEN VERDAMPFER | [2011/30] | English: | SUCTION TUBE CONSTRUCTION, AN EVAPORATOR USING SUCH A SUCTION TUBE CONSTRUCTION AND A DOMESTIC REFRIGERATING DEVICE WITH THE SUCTION TUBE CONSTRUCTION OR WITH AN EVAPORATOR USING THE LATTER. | [2011/30] | French: | STRUCTURE TUBULAIRE D'ASPIRATION-ÉTRANGLEMENT, ÉVAPORATEUR UTILISANT CETTE STRUCTURE ET APPAREIL RÉFRIGÉRANT MÉNAGER MUNI DE LA STRUCTURE TUBULAIRE D'ASPIRATION-ÉTRANGLEMENT OU D'UN ÉVAPORATEUR UTILISANT CETTE STRUCTURE | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 06.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2009 | CY | 09.01.2019 | CZ | 09.01.2019 | DK | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | ES | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | HR | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | MK | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | NL | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | SE | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SK | 09.01.2019 | SM | 09.01.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | NO | 09.04.2019 | GR | 10.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 06.11.2009 | |
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.11.2009 | |
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | CZ | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | CZ | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 09.01.2019 | |
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 09.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]DE1250845 (WIELAND-WERKE AG) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 6 [I] 5,7-10; | [A]DE973828 (GEN MOTORS CORP) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [I]DE1904245 (VER DEUTSCHE METALLWERKE AG) [I] 1-5,7-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4147037 (GELBARD ROBERT B, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH10132396 (HOSHIZAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 6 * abstract *; | [A]GB2418478 (TI GROUP AUTOMOTIVE SYS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2008267757 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE1250845 | JP2008267757 |