EP2376543 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A FUNCTIONALIZED DIENE ELASTOMER, SUCH AS A POLYBUTADIENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 12 cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states Société de Technologie MICHELIN 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERT, Pierre Manufacture Francaise des Pneumatiques Michelin DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 02 /
THUILLIEZ, Julien 40 rue de Blanzat F-63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Le Cam, Véronique Marie Christine Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Le Cam, Véronique Marie Christine Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin 23 Place des Carmes-Déchaux SGD/LG/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09764536.0 | 07.12.2009 | WO2009EP66542 | Priority number, date | FR20080058581 | 15.12.2008 Original published format: FR 0858581 | [2011/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010069805 | Date: | 24.06.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2376543 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2376543 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08F36/04, C08F36/06, C08F4/54 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
C08C19/44 (EP);
C08F36/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F36/04, C08F4/545 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FUNKTIONALISIERTEN DIENELASTOMERS, WIE EINES POLYBUTADIENS | [2011/42] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A FUNCTIONALIZED DIENE ELASTOMER, SUCH AS A POLYBUTADIENE | [2011/42] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN ELASTOMERE DIENIQUE FONCTIONNALISE, TEL QU'UN POLYBUTADIENE | [2011/42] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 10.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2009 | AT | 17.09.2014 | BG | 17.09.2014 | CY | 17.09.2014 | CZ | 17.09.2014 | DK | 17.09.2014 | EE | 17.09.2014 | ES | 17.09.2014 | FI | 17.09.2014 | HR | 17.09.2014 | IT | 17.09.2014 | LT | 17.09.2014 | LV | 17.09.2014 | MC | 17.09.2014 | MK | 17.09.2014 | MT | 17.09.2014 | NL | 17.09.2014 | PL | 17.09.2014 | RO | 17.09.2014 | SE | 17.09.2014 | SI | 17.09.2014 | SK | 17.09.2014 | SM | 17.09.2014 | TR | 17.09.2014 | IE | 07.12.2014 | LU | 07.12.2014 | GB | 17.12.2014 | NO | 17.12.2014 | GR | 18.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | IS | 17.01.2015 | PT | 19.01.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 07.12.2009 | |
AT | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
GB | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.12.2009 | |
AT | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
GB | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
GB | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
GB | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
GB | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
GB | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
GB | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 17.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP1845118 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR]; MICHELIN RECH TECH [CH]) [AD] 1-24 * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0023] * * example - *; | [A]WO0018812 (MONTELL TECHNOLOGY COMPANY BV [NL]; GALIMBERTI MAURIZIO [IT]; FUSCO OF) [A] 1-21 * example - * |