|
25.11.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2014 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.01.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2011 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.03.2011 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
10.06.2010 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
01.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
01.12.2009 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
01.12.2009 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
01.12.2009 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
29 |
|
01.12.2009 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
16 |