11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
27.11.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
04.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
21.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
14.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
10.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
02.01.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
17.12.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.11.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.11.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.10.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
14.07.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.07.2014 |
Change - French title |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
15.02.2014 |
Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.01.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.06.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.12.2012 |
First examination report |
|
03.02.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.02.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
10.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.09.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
09.09.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
09.09.2011 |
Change - designated states |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
02.09.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
30.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|