EP2315863 - METHOD OF PRODUCING ALUMINIUM IN AN ELECTROLYSIS CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rio Tinto Alcan International Limited 400-1190 Avenue des Canadiens de Montréal Montréal, QC H3B 0E3 / CA | [2016/46] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states Rio Tinto Alcan International Limited 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montréal, QC H3A 3G2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARDEAU, Sylvain Varcinières F-73300 Jarrier / FR | 02 /
SULMONT, Benoît 416 chemin Chiron F-73000 Chambéry / FR | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | Malcoiffe, Julien, et al Rio Tinto France SAS 725, rue Aristide Bergès BP 25 Voreppe 38341 Moirans Cedex / FR | [2012/17] |
Former [2011/18] | Mérigeault, Thierry Louis Henri ALCAN France SAS 725 Rue Aristide Bergès BP 25 Voreppe 38341 Moirans Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09765555.9 | 05.06.2009 | [2011/18] | WO2009EP04124 | Priority number, date | EP20080356087 | 16.06.2008 Original published format: EP 08356087 | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009152975 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2315863 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2315863 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/20 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
C25C3/20 (EP,US);
C25C3/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/42] |
Former [2011/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALUMINIUM IN EINER ELEKTROLYSEZELLE | [2011/18] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING ALUMINIUM IN AN ELECTROLYSIS CELL | [2011/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ALUMINIUM DANS UNE CELLULE ÉLECTROLYSE | [2017/32] |
Former [2011/18] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ALUMINIUM DANS UNE CELLULE D'ÉLECTROLYSE | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 14.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2009 | AT | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | CZ | 18.10.2017 | DK | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | ES | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | HR | 18.10.2017 | IT | 18.10.2017 | LT | 18.10.2017 | LV | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | MK | 18.10.2017 | PL | 18.10.2017 | PT | 18.10.2017 | SE | 18.10.2017 | TR | 18.10.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | IE | 05.06.2018 | LU | 05.06.2018 | MT | 05.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 05.06.2009 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
MT | 05.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
MT | 05.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
MT | 05.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4654130 (TABEREAUX ALTON T [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * column 2, lines 20-68 * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 19 *; | [X]DE1483343 (REYNOLDS METALS CO) [X] 1-19 * claims 1-5,10,11 *; | [X]US6609119 (MEGHLAOUI ABDELHAMID [AE]) [X] 1-19 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 12 * * column 6, line 28 - column 7, line 58 * * column 8, line 35 - column 9, line 27 * * column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 10 *; | [X]US6126809 (LARSEN ASBJOERN SIGURD [NO]) [X] 1-19 * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 8 *; | [X]US5089093 (BLATCH GEOFFREY I [AU], et al) [X] 1-19 * column 9, line 3 - column 12, line 43 * |