EP2313384 - PHENYL-ALKYL PIPERAZINES HAVING A MODULATING ACTIVITY OF TNF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2013/38] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states SANOFI 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue de la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states SANOFI 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis 174 Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARONI, Marco c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
RITZELER, Olaf c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
ZANCHET, Marco c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | [2013/38] |
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
BARONI, Marco c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
RITZELER, Olaf c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
03 /
ZANCHET, Marco c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Veinante, Aude, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2013/38] |
Former [2011/17] | Veinante, Aude, et al Sanofi-Aventis Département Brevets 174, avenue de France FR-75013 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09766076.5 | 16.06.2009 | [2011/17] | WO2009FR51138 | Priority number, date | FR20080003337 | 16.06.2008 Original published format: FR 0803337 | FR20080007361 | 23.12.2008 Original published format: FR 0807361 | [2011/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009153514 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2313384 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2313384 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/073, A61K31/495, A61P19/02, A61P29/00, A61P37/00 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
C07D295/073 (EP,CN,US);
C07D213/76 (EP,CN,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P31/08 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | PHENYLALKYLPIPERAZINE MIT TNF-MODULIERENDER WIRKUNG | [2011/17] | English: | PHENYL-ALKYL PIPERAZINES HAVING A MODULATING ACTIVITY OF TNF | [2011/17] | French: | PHENYL-ALKYL PIPERAZINES AYANT UNE ACTIVITE MODULATRICE DU TNF | [2011/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 29.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2001072660 (WELFIDE CORP) [Y] 1-15 * pages 49-51; claim 1; compounds 141-150 *; | [Y]WO2004060308 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claim 32; table 3; compounds 508,573,679 *; | [Y] - HANANO T ET AL, "Novel phenylpiperazine derivatives as dual cytokine regulators with TNF-alpha suppressing and IL-10 augmenting activity", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, (20000501), vol. 10, no. 9, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 875 - 879, XP004199033 [Y] 1-15 * figure 2; table 2; compound 5F * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)00128-1 | [Y] - HANANO T ET AL, "Novel DMARDs on the basis of a new concept of dual cytokine regulation, TNF-alpha suppression and IL-10 augmentation", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, (20000501), vol. 10, no. 9, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 881 - 884, XP004199034 [Y] 1-15 * table 1; compound 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)00129-3 |