EP2323825 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A CORE HAVING AN EVELOPE CONTAINING GRANULAR AND/OR POWDER PRODUCTS, APPARATUS AND CORE OBTAINED. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/21] | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A CORE HAVING AN EVELOPE CONTAINING GRANULAR AND/OR POWDER PRODUCTS, APPARATUS AND CORE OBTAINED | ||
[2014/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Opérations SAS 316, route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | [2011/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE HETET, Thomas 26 rue du Jardin de la Fontaine F - 44118 La Chevrolière / FR | 02 /
MUSSEAU, Florian 157 rue du Croissant F-44300 Nantes / FR | 03 /
CAVALIERE, Frédérick 9 quai Fernand Pouillon F-78180 Montigny Le Bretonneux / FR | [2011/22] |
Former [2011/21] | 01 /
LE HETET, Thomas 9 avenue de la Vendée F-44140 Geneston / FR | ||
02 /
MUSSEAU, Florian 157 rue du Croissant F-44300 Nantes / FR | |||
03 /
CAVALIERE, Frédérick 9 quai Fernand Pouillon F-78180 Montigny Le Bretonneux / FR | Representative(s) | Fantin, Laurent Aquinov Allée de la Forestière 33750 Beychac et Caillau / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Fantin, Laurent Aquinov Allée de la Forestière 33750 Beychac et Caillau / FR | ||
Former [2011/21] | Fantin, Laurent Aquinov Allée de la Forestière 33750 Beychac et Caillau / FR | Application number, filing date | 09766085.6 | 17.06.2009 | [2011/21] | WO2009FR51152 | Priority number, date | FR20080054099 | 20.06.2008 Original published format: FR 0854099 | [2011/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009153523 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2323825 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2323825 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/38, B29C33/54 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
B29C33/3821 (EP,US);
B29C33/54 (EP,US);
B29C33/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KERNS MIT EINER HÜLLE BEINHALTEND GRANULAT- UND/ODER PULVERFÖRMIGE PRODUKTE, VORRICHTUNG UND HERGESTELLTER KERN. | [2014/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A CORE HAVING AN EVELOPE CONTAINING GRANULAR AND/OR POWDER PRODUCTS, APPARATUS AND CORE OBTAINED. | [2014/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN NOYAU COMPRENANT UNE ENVELOPPE CONTENANT DES PRODUITS GRANULEUX ET/OU PULVERULENTS, DISPOSITIF ET NOYEAU OBTENU. | [2014/17] |
Former [2011/21] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES EINE HÜLLE MIT KÖRNIGEN UND/ODER PULVERFÖRMIGEN PRODUKTEN AUFWEISENDEN KERNS, VORRICHTUNG UND ERHALTENER KERN | ||
Former [2011/21] | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A CORE HAVING AN EVELOPE CONTAINING GRANULAR AND/OR POWDER PRODUCTS, APPARATUS AND CORE OBTAINED | ||
Former [2011/21] | PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN NOYAU COMPRENANT UNE ENVELOPPE CONTENANT DES PRODUITS GRANULEUX ET/OU PULVERULENTS, DISPOSITIF ET NOYEAU OBTENU | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 07.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2009 | AT | 24.09.2014 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | CZ | 24.09.2014 | DK | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | ES | 24.09.2014 | FI | 24.09.2014 | HR | 24.09.2014 | IT | 24.09.2014 | LT | 24.09.2014 | LV | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | MK | 24.09.2014 | MT | 24.09.2014 | NL | 24.09.2014 | PL | 24.09.2014 | RO | 24.09.2014 | SE | 24.09.2014 | SI | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | TR | 24.09.2014 | NO | 24.12.2014 | GR | 25.12.2014 | IS | 24.01.2015 | PT | 26.01.2015 | IE | 17.06.2015 | LU | 17.06.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 17.06.2009 | |
AT | 24.09.2014 | ||
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
TR | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 17.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 17.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 17.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 24.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPS61202827 (AISIN SEIKI, et al) [X] 10 * abstract *[A] 1-9; | [XA]DE102005056420 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 10 * paragraphs [0001] - [0037]; figures 1-3 * [A] 1-9; | [XA]WO2008003768 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 10 * page 9, line 16 - page 15, line L; figures 1-6 * [A] 1-9 |