EP2323511 - IMPROVEMENT TO CYCLING FOOTWEAR EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carnac Sport Bât. A1 20 rue de la Rainière 44300 Nantes / FR | [2011/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POHU, Xavier 122 rue de la Sinandière F-44150 Ancenis / FR | [2011/21] | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Michelet, Alain Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/21] | Michelet, Alain Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/21] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09766086.4 | 17.06.2009 | [2011/21] | WO2009FR51156 | Priority number, date | FR20080003407 | 18.06.2008 Original published format: FR 0803407 | [2011/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009153524 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2323511 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2323511 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A43D999/00, A43B5/14, A43B3/24 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
A43B5/14 (EP);
A43B3/24 (EP);
A43B3/246 (EP);
A43D999/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/21] | A43B5/14, A43B3/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/21] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG AN RADFAHR-FUSSBEKLEIDUNGSAUSRÜSTUNG | [2011/21] | English: | IMPROVEMENT TO CYCLING FOOTWEAR EQUIPMENT | [2011/21] | French: | PERFECTIONNEMENT AUX EQUIPEMENTS CHAUSSANTS POUR LA PRATIQUE DU CYCLISME | [2011/21] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 22.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2009 | AT | 25.04.2012 | CY | 25.04.2012 | CZ | 25.04.2012 | DK | 25.04.2012 | EE | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | HR | 25.04.2012 | IT | 25.04.2012 | LT | 25.04.2012 | LV | 25.04.2012 | MK | 25.04.2012 | MT | 25.04.2012 | NL | 25.04.2012 | PL | 25.04.2012 | RO | 25.04.2012 | SE | 25.04.2012 | SI | 25.04.2012 | SK | 25.04.2012 | TR | 25.04.2012 | IE | 17.06.2012 | LU | 17.06.2012 | BE | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | BG | 25.07.2012 | NO | 25.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | ES | 05.08.2012 | IS | 25.08.2012 | PT | 27.08.2012 | DE | 01.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MK | 25.04.2012 | ||
MT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
LU | 17.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
DE | 01.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MK | 25.04.2012 | ||
MT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
DE | 01.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MK | 25.04.2012 | ||
MT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
DE | 01.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MK | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
DE | 01.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MK | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 17.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MK | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | |
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 25.04.2012 | |
NO | 25.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE8906339U (GAESSLER, BERND, DIPL.-ING., 6370 OBERURSEL, DE) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraphs 1-4 * * page 5, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 6, paragraph 3; figure - *; | [A]US2005210712 (JAU GUO J [TW], et al) [A] 1 * page 2 - page 3; figures 1,2,7,10 *; | [A]EP1700531 (SIDI SPORT S R L [IT]) [A] 1* the whole document * |