EP2289996 - FLUORORESIN FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited Shin-Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATAYAMA, Hajime c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
ARUGA, Hiroshi c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2014/37] |
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
KATAYAMA, Hajime c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | ||
02 /
ARUGA, Hiroshi c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/09] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09766572.3 | 10.06.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009JP60641 | Priority number, date | JP20080156817 | 16.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008156817 | [2011/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009154124 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2289996 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2289996 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/12, B32B27/30, C08J5/18, C08J7/04, C08K9/06, C08K3/34, C09C1/04, C09C1/36 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
A01G9/1438 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C09C1/043 (EP,US);
C09C3/12 (EP,US);
C01P2004/84 (US);
C08J2327/12 (EP,US);
Y02A40/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2995 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/09] | C08L27/12, B32B27/30, C08J5/18, C08J7/04, C08K9/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | FLUORHARZFILM | [2011/09] | English: | FLUORORESIN FILM | [2011/09] | French: | FILM DE FLUORÉSINE | [2011/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2010 | Translation filed | 25.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 22.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 31.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2009 | AT | 10.09.2014 | BE | 10.09.2014 | BG | 10.09.2014 | CY | 10.09.2014 | CZ | 10.09.2014 | DK | 10.09.2014 | EE | 10.09.2014 | ES | 10.09.2014 | FI | 10.09.2014 | HR | 10.09.2014 | IT | 10.09.2014 | LT | 10.09.2014 | LV | 10.09.2014 | MC | 10.09.2014 | MK | 10.09.2014 | MT | 10.09.2014 | NL | 10.09.2014 | PL | 10.09.2014 | RO | 10.09.2014 | SE | 10.09.2014 | SI | 10.09.2014 | SK | 10.09.2014 | TR | 10.09.2014 | NO | 10.12.2014 | GR | 11.12.2014 | IS | 10.01.2015 | PT | 12.01.2015 | GB | 10.06.2015 | IE | 10.06.2015 | LU | 10.06.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 10.06.2009 | |
AT | 10.09.2014 | ||
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
TR | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
GB | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
GB | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
GB | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
GB | 10.06.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 10.09.2014 | |
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 10.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH11279358 ; | [I] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 54, Database accession no. 1999-629399, XP002671841 & JPH11279358 A 19991012 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [I] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH073047 (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK); | [A]JPH10292056 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JP2000287559 (ASAHI GLASS GREEN TEKKU KK); | [A]JP2007162029 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD, et al); | [AP]WO2008129901 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [AP]JP2008280465 (UNIV UTSUNOMIYA) | by applicant | JPH03142237 | JPH073047 | JPH0811268 | JP2006152061 | JP2008156817 |