EP2289958 - CURABLE COMPOSITION AND CURED FILM USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited Shin-Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Masahiro c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
ERIGUCHI, Takeshi c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 03 /
ISHIBASHI, Yuichiro c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 04 /
TSURUOKA, Kaori c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 05 /
ABE, Takefumi c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2014/40] |
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
ITO, Masahiro c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | ||
02 /
ERIGUCHI, Takeshi c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | |||
03 /
ISHIBASHI, Yuichiro c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | |||
04 /
TSURUOKA, Kaori c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | |||
05 /
ABE, Takefumi c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/09] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09766702.6 | 18.06.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009JP61115 | Priority number, date | JP20080160197 | 19.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008160197 | [2011/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009154254 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2289958 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2289958 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08F290/06, C08G65/40, C09D4/06, C08F251/00 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
C08G65/4006 (EP,KR,US);
C08F259/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08F283/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08F283/085 (EP,KR,US);
C08F290/06 (KR);
C08F290/062 (EP,KR,US);
C08G65/323 (KR);
C08L71/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09D4/06 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F283/06, C08F220/26 (EP,US);
C08L71/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2011/09] | C08F290/06, C08G65/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND GEHÄRTETER FILM DARAUS | [2011/09] | English: | CURABLE COMPOSITION AND CURED FILM USING SAME | [2011/09] | French: | COMPOSITION DURCISSABLE ET FILM DURCI L'UTILISANT | [2011/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2010 | Translation filed | 23.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 11.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2009 | AT | 01.10.2014 | BE | 01.10.2014 | BG | 01.10.2014 | CY | 01.10.2014 | CZ | 01.10.2014 | DK | 01.10.2014 | EE | 01.10.2014 | ES | 01.10.2014 | FI | 01.10.2014 | HR | 01.10.2014 | LT | 01.10.2014 | LV | 01.10.2014 | MC | 01.10.2014 | MK | 01.10.2014 | MT | 01.10.2014 | NL | 01.10.2014 | PL | 01.10.2014 | RO | 01.10.2014 | SE | 01.10.2014 | SI | 01.10.2014 | SK | 01.10.2014 | TR | 01.10.2014 | NO | 01.01.2015 | GR | 02.01.2015 | IS | 01.02.2015 | PT | 02.02.2015 | GB | 18.06.2015 | IE | 18.06.2015 | LU | 18.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | FR | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/46] | HU | 18.06.2009 | |
AT | 01.10.2014 | ||
BE | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 01.10.2014 | ||
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 18.06.2015 | ||
IE | 18.06.2015 | ||
LU | 18.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 18.06.2009 | |
AT | 01.10.2014 | ||
BG | 01.10.2014 | ||
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 18.06.2015 | ||
IE | 18.06.2015 | ||
LU | 18.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 18.06.2015 | ||
IE | 18.06.2015 | ||
LU | 18.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 18.06.2015 | ||
IE | 18.06.2015 | ||
LU | 18.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 18.06.2015 | ||
IE | 18.06.2015 | ||
LU | 18.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.06.2015 | ||
LU | 18.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.06.2015 | ||
LU | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
DK | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
SE | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
ES | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
NO | 01.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
NL | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 01.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2007186608 (JSR CORP) [X] 1-12 * abstract * [Y] 1-12; | [XY]JP2007188741 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-12 * abstract * [Y] 1-12; | [Y]EP1897897 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2007186608 (JSR CORP); | [X]JP2007188741 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | Examination | US5250667 | US2005107569 | by applicant | US6361926 | WO03008483 | JPH1074750 | WO2006137327 | JPH07503740 | WO2007119384 |