EP2307389 - DIBENZOTHIAZEPINE DERIVATIVE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/15] | DIBENZOTHIAZEPINE DERIVATIVES AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2012/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CY | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Dean AstraZeneca R&D Boston 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 02 /
DAMEWOOD, James R. AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington Delaware 19850-5437 / US | 03 /
EDWARDS, Phil c/o AstraZeneca Intellectual Property AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437, Wilmington Delaware 19850-5437 / US | 04 /
HULSIZER, James c/o Astrazeneca Intellectual Property AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, Delaware 19850-5437 / US | 05 /
MUIR, James Campbell AstraZeneca Charter Way Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 2NA / GB | 06 /
PIERSON JR., M. Edward AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington Delaware 19850-5437 / US | 07 /
SHENVI, Ashokkumar Bhikkappa AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington c/o Astrazeneca Intellectual Property 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437, Wilmington Delaware 19850-5437 / US | 08 /
WESOLOWSKI, Steven AstraZeneca R&D Boston 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 09 /
WIDZOWSKI, Dan AstraZeneca R&D Boston 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 10 /
WOOD, Michael AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington DE 19850-5437 / US | [2013/04] |
Former [2011/15] | 01 /
BROWN, Dean AstraZeneca R&D Boston 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, MA 02451 / US | ||
02 /
DAMEWOOD, James R. AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington Delaware 19850-5437 / US | |||
03 /
EDWARDS, Phil c/o AstraZeneca Intellectual Property AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington Delaware 19850-5437 / US | |||
04 /
HULSIZER, James c/o Astrazeneca Intellectual Property AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, Delaware 19850-5437 / US | |||
05 /
MUIR, James Campbell AstraZeneca Charter Way Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 2NA / GB | |||
06 /
PIERSON JR., M. Edward AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington Delaware 19850-5437 / US | |||
07 /
SHENVI, Ashokkumar Bhikkappa AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington c/o Astrazeneca Intellectual Property 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington Delaware 19850-5437 / US | |||
08 /
WESOLOWSKI, Steven AstraZeneca R&D Boston 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, MA 02451 / US | |||
09 /
WIDZOWSKI, Dan AstraZeneca R&D Boston 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, MA 02451 / US | |||
10 /
WOOD, Michael AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington DE 19850-5437 / US | Representative(s) | Curran, Clair, et al Ropes & Gray International LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3BF / GB | [2013/39] |
Former [2011/15] | Steinrud, Henrik, et al AstraZeneca AB Global Intellectual Property S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 09766953.5 | 18.06.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009SE50763 | Priority number, date | US20080074417P | 20.06.2008 Original published format: US 74417 P | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009154563 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2307389 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2307389 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2012 | Supplementary international search report - requested on: | RU | 18.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D281/16, A61K31/554, A61P25/18, A61P25/24, A61P25/22 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/554 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
C07D281/16 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/15] | C07D281/16, A61K31/554, A61P25/18, A61P25/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/15] | Extension states | AL | 20.01.2011 | BA | 20.01.2011 | RS | 20.01.2011 | Title | German: | DIBENZOTHIAZEPINDERIVAT UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2012/39] | English: | DIBENZOTHIAZEPINE DERIVATIVE AND USE THEREOF | [2012/39] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE DIBENZOTHIAZÉPINE ET SON UTILISATION | [2012/39] |
Former [2011/15] | DIBENZOTHIAZEPINDERIVATE UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2011/15] | DIBENZOTHIAZEPINE DERIVATIVES AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2011/15] | DÉRIVÉS DE DIBENZOTHIAZÉPINE ET LEUR UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 11.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2014/09] |
Former [2014/01] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
Former [2013/52] | CY | 23.01.2013 | |
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | NO | 23.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]CH422793 (WANDER AG DR A [CH]) [YD] 1-15 * page 2, lines 79-82; claim - *; | [XY]FR1508536 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO) [X] 1,8-15 * page 1; résumé * [Y] 2-7; | [Y]US3539573 (SCHMUTZ JEAN, et al) [Y] 1-15* column 2, lines 36-39; claim - *; | [XY]EP0447857 (HOKURIKU PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [X] 1,8-15 * page 7, lines 35-39; claim - * [Y] 2-7; | [XY]WO2005063254 (ACADIA PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,8-15 * abstract * [Y] 2-7; | [XY]US2006063754 (EDGAR DALE M [US], et al) [X] 1,8-15 * paragraphs [0243] - [0248]; claim - * [Y] 2-7 | International search | [A]GB980853 (WANDER S A A); | [A]SU457220 ; | [A]RU2006126720 | International search | [X]US3962248 (SCHNEIDER JOSEF); | [X]EP0447857 (HOKURIKU PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]); | [X]WO9618621 (ALLELIX BIOPHARMA [CA]); | [X]WO2005063254 (ACADIA PHARM INC [US], et al); | [X]US2006063754 (EDGAR DALE M [US], et al); | [A]WO2006073360 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [A]US2006217366 (DAVIS PATRICIA C [US], et al); | [X]WO2006107948 (ACADIA PHARM INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2007053618 (ACADIA PHARM INC [US], et al) | by applicant | NL293210 | CH422793 | FR1508536 | US3539573 | EP0447857 | US2006063754 | US7491715 | US7517871 | - "Behavioral Approach to Nondyskinetic Antagonists: Identification of Seroquel", J. MED. CHEM., (2001), vol. 44, pages 372 - 380 | - LAZARENO, METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 106, pages 231 - 245 | - DE BACKER ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1993), vol. 197, no. 3, page 1601 |