|
04.10.2024 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2024 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2024 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2024 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2024 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.08.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.08.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2024 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.06.2024 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.06.2024 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.06.2024 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.06.2024 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.06.2024 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
90 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
90 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
90 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
90 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
81 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.11.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.11.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.11.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.11.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.04.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.04.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2023 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2023 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
17 |
|
21.12.2022 |
Description |
Opposition |
15 |
|
21.12.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2022 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.12.2022 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.11.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.11.2022 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2022 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.10.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.10.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.10.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.10.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2022 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2022 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
06.10.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
06.10.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
06.10.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
30.09.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
26.09.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.07.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.07.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.07.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.06.2022 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.06.2022 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.06.2022 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2022 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
17 |
|
15.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
17 |
|
15.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
17 |
|
10.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2022 |
Annexes filed during the Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.2022 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
16 |
|
10.06.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.06.2022 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.05.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.05.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2022 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
18.05.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
18.05.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
18.05.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2021 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2021 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2021 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2021 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.07.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.07.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.07.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.07.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2019 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
49 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.03.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
04.01.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
67 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
17.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
01.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.06.2016 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
21 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
99 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
38 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
84 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
68 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
326 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
127 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
328 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
56 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
64 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
57 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
74 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
159 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
145 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.02.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
103 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2014 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
111 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
110 |
|
04.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
14.01.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
84 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
126 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
23 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
94 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
8 |