Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023265111 | ![]() | 24.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217714227 | 06.04.2022 | US201414449328 | 01.08.2014 | US201816163694 | 18.10.2018 | US201815928139 | 22.03.2018 | US201916570065 | 13.09.2019 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | US202117198442 | 11.03.2021 | US202117483724 | 23.09.2021 | US202016788824 | 12.02.2020 | US201715701791 | 12.09.2017 | US201514880776 | 12.10.2015 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US202318311290 | 03.05.2023 | US202217964968 | 13.10.2022 | US201916406159 | 08.05.2019 | US202017009199 | 01.09.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022009948 | ![]() | 13.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414449328 | 01.08.2014 | US201816163694 | 18.10.2018 | US201815928139 | 22.03.2018 | US201916570065 | 13.09.2019 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | US202117198442 | 11.03.2021 | US202117483724 | 23.09.2021 | US202016788824 | 12.02.2020 | US201715701791 | 12.09.2017 | US201514880776 | 12.10.2015 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US201916406159 | 08.05.2019 | US202017009199 | 01.09.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021198289 | ![]() | 01.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414449328 | 01.08.2014 | US201816163694 | 18.10.2018 | US201815928139 | 22.03.2018 | US201916570065 | 13.09.2019 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | US202117198442 | 11.03.2021 | US202016788824 | 12.02.2020 | US201715701791 | 12.09.2017 | US201514880776 | 12.10.2015 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US201916406159 | 08.05.2019 | US202017009199 | 01.09.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020392164 | ![]() | 17.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414449328 | 01.08.2014 | US201816163694 | 18.10.2018 | US201815928139 | 22.03.2018 | US201916570065 | 13.09.2019 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | US202016788824 | 12.02.2020 | US201715701791 | 12.09.2017 | US201514880776 | 12.10.2015 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US201916406159 | 08.05.2019 | US202017009199 | 01.09.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020181176 | ![]() | 11.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414449328 | 01.08.2014 | US201816163694 | 18.10.2018 | US201715701791 | 12.09.2017 | US201815928139 | 22.03.2018 | US201514880776 | 12.10.2015 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US201916570065 | 13.09.2019 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | US201916406159 | 08.05.2019 | US202016788824 | 12.02.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019263839 | ![]() | 29.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414449328 | 01.08.2014 | US201816163694 | 18.10.2018 | US201715701791 | 12.09.2017 | US201815928139 | 22.03.2018 | US201514880776 | 12.10.2015 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | US201916406159 | 08.05.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019048028 | ![]() | 14.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414449328 | 01.08.2014 | US201816163694 | 18.10.2018 | US201715701791 | 12.09.2017 | US201815928139 | 22.03.2018 | US201514880776 | 12.10.2015 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018208609 | ![]() | 26.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414449328 | 01.08.2014 | US201715701791 | 12.09.2017 | US201815928139 | 22.03.2018 | US201514880776 | 12.10.2015 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018002350 | ![]() | 04.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414449328 | 01.08.2014 | US201715701791 | 12.09.2017 | US201514880776 | 12.10.2015 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016031913 | ![]() | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414449328 | 01.08.2014 | US201514880776 | 12.10.2015 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9175017 | ![]() | 03.11.2015 | B2 | US2015307523 | 29.10.2015 | A9 | US2014349966 | 27.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | US201414449275 | 01.08.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9175018 | ![]() | 03.11.2015 | B2 | US2014343314 | 20.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414449328 | 01.08.2014 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8859504 | ![]() | 14.10.2014 | B2 | US2014018301 | 16.01.2014 | A9 | US2013165390 | 27.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009325903 | ![]() | 31.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11485746 | ![]() | 01.11.2022 | B2 | US2020247829 | 06.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414449328 | 01.08.2014 | US201816163694 | 18.10.2018 | US201815928139 | 22.03.2018 | US201916570065 | 13.09.2019 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | US202016788824 | 12.02.2020 | US201715701791 | 12.09.2017 | US201514880776 | 12.10.2015 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US201916406159 | 08.05.2019 | US202016857227 | 24.04.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10604538 | ![]() | 31.03.2020 | B2 | US2020002361 | 02.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414449328 | 01.08.2014 | US201816163694 | 18.10.2018 | US201715701791 | 12.09.2017 | US201815928139 | 22.03.2018 | US201514880776 | 12.10.2015 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US201916570065 | 13.09.2019 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | US201916406159 | 08.05.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10526351 | ![]() | 07.01.2020 | B2 | US2019152997 | 23.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414449328 | 01.08.2014 | US201816163694 | 18.10.2018 | US201715701791 | 12.09.2017 | US201815928139 | 22.03.2018 | US201514880776 | 12.10.2015 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US201916260596 | 29.01.2019 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | US201213667164 | 02.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101860743B | ![]() | 24.05.2018 | B1 | KR20170068599 | 19.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101741142B | ![]() | 29.05.2017 | B1 | KR20140107483 | 04.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101704694B | ![]() | 08.02.2017 | B1 | KR20140107482 | 04.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101691093B | ![]() | 29.12.2016 | B1 | KR20110043599 | 27.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101690571B | ![]() | 28.12.2016 | B1 | KR20140094663 | 30.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023158150 | ![]() | 26.10.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | JP2021109909 | 01.07.2021 | JP2019216272 | 29.11.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021165288 | ![]() | 14.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | JP2019216272 | 29.11.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5566380B | ![]() | 06.08.2014 | B2 | JP2011524903 | 08.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL234286 | ![]() | 30.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL234285 | ![]() | 30.04.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL210056 | ![]() | 30.04.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3536693 | ![]() | 11.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | EP13191413 | 16.06.2009 | EP09767050 | 16.06.2009 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2733147 | ![]() | 21.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | EP09767050 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2730581 | ![]() | 27.04.2016 | B1 | EP2730581 | 14.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | EP09767050 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2730580 | ![]() | 14.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | EP09767050 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2730579 | ![]() | 14.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | EP09767050 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2921946 | ![]() | 08.01.2019 | C | CA2921946 | 23.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | CA2727862 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2727862 | ![]() | 19.04.2016 | C | CA2727862 | 23.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009260778B | ![]() | 28.08.2014 | B2 | AU2009260778 | 23.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2318419 | ![]() | 30.10.2024 | B2 | EP2318419 | 08.04.2015 | B1 | EP2318419 | 11.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR095554 | 28.10.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR095566 | 28.10.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR100011 | 07.09.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122014008750 | 03.11.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | BRPI0915300 | 16.06.2009 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122014008753 | 29.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | BRPI0915300 | 16.06.2009 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122014008754 | 03.11.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | BRPI0915300 | 16.06.2009 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0915300 | 25.05.2021 | C1 | BRPI0915300 | 07.07.2020 | B8 | BRPI0915300 | 23.06.2020 | B1 | BRPI0915300 | 27.10.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102066386 | 18.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107253966 | 17.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | CN200980123013 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107253975 | 17.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | CN200980123013 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107266480 | 20.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | CN200980123013 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107266482 | 20.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | CN200980123013 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CR20160014 | 08.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CR20160015 | 09.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1116435T | 08.02.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | EP09767050 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2318419T | 02.12.2024 | T4 | DK2318419T | 29.06.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2730581T | 15.08.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | EP09767050 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA027346 | 31.07.2017 | B1 | EA201170036 | 30.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2541467T | 31.03.2025 | T5 | ES2541467T | 20.07.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI2318419T | 29.01.2025 | T4 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GEP20135847 | 10.06.2013 | B | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1157786 | 06.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20150592T | 14.02.2025 | T4 | HRP20150592T | 03.07.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | EP09767050 | 16.06.2009 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA32471 | 03.07.2011 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2010013642 | 21.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX340186 | 29.06.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX349769 | 11.08.2017 | B | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX358222 | 10.08.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO2017016I | 04.05.2017 | I1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ603236 | 30.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | NZ59001409 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ624121 | 27.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ60323609 | 16.06.2009 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ624122 | 27.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ60323609 | 16.06.2009 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ624123 | 27.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ60323609 | 16.06.2009 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12015501191 | 24.10.2018 | B1 | PH12015501191 | 11.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12015501192 | 11.01.2016 | B1 | PH12015501192 | 11.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12015501193 | 11.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2318419T | 31.08.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | EP09767050 | 16.06.2009 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS54020 | 30.10.2015 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2318419T | 31.07.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | EP09767050 | 16.06.2009 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI498333B | 01.09.2015 | B | TW201002727 | 16.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI542351B | 21.07.2016 | B | TW201433317 | 01.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI543985B | 01.08.2016 | B | TW201433569 | 01.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | US48534409 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA106205 | 11.08.2014 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA115131 | 25.09.2017 | C2 | Priority number | Date | UAA201100448 | 16.06.2009 | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201009177 | 28.03.2012 | B | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | WO2009US03602 | 16.06.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009154737 | ![]() | 23.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020055829 | ![]() | 09.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017214396 | ![]() | 07.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6110813B | ![]() | 05.04.2017 | B2 | JP2014196310 | 16.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014169317 | ![]() | 18.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5926319B | ![]() | 25.05.2016 | B2 | JP2014169316 | 18.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6010066B | ![]() | 19.10.2016 | B2 | JP2014144981 | 14.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR072162 | 11.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2010001475 | 11.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103435638 | 11.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103450241 | 18.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103467565 | 25.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103497210 | 08.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103497232 | 08.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO6321289 | 20.09.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CR11850 | 14.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DOP2010000384 | 15.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA030685 | 28.09.2018 | B1 | EA201500430 | 30.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA201500431 | 30.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA201500432 | 30.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ECSP11010763 | 28.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ECSP14010763 | 31.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2585114T | 03.10.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GEP201706703B | 25.07.2017 | B | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1198252 | 20.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1198253 | 20.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1198254 | 20.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1199260 | 26.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1244809 | 17.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1244810 | 17.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1244811 | 17.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1244827 | 17.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY155592 | 13.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY171021 | 23.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20100256 | 14.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20141064 | 05.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20141065 | 05.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20141076 | 05.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20141078 | 05.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2318419E | 25.08.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2730581T | 17.08.2016 | T | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201701524X | 27.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG194349 | 29.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201109368 | 30.10.2013 | B | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201304728 | 27.01.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201504133 | 30.11.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | US21149909 | 31.03.2009 | US13224408 | 17.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | EP2730579 | EP2730580 | EP2733147 | EP2730581 | EP3536693 |