EP2310529 - MICROVESICLE-BASED COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proxy Life Science Holdings, Inc. 30600 San Pasqual Road Temecula, CA 92591 / US | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIETRZKOWSKI, Zbigniew 68 Plateau Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US | [2012/18] |
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
PIETRZKOWSKI, Zbigniew 8594 Henry Street Dyer, IN 46311 / US | Representative(s) | van Kooij, Adriaan, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | van Kooij, Adriaan, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelickplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09767814.8 | 19.06.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009US47937 | Priority number, date | US20080074218P | 20.06.2008 Original published format: US 74218 P | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009155505 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2310529 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
C12Q2600/112 (EP);
C12Q2600/158 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN AUF MIKROVESIKELBASIS | [2011/16] | English: | MICROVESICLE-BASED COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2011/16] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS À BASE DE MICROVÉSICULES | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 06.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/27] | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2011 | 30.06.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDAI]WO2005121369 (SOURCEPHARM INC [US]; PIETRZKOWSKI ZBIGNIEW [US]) [XD] 1-2,9,11,13-14,17-18 * page 3, paragraph 3; claims 33-37 * * page 11, paragraph 3 * * page 19, paragraph 4 - page 21, paragraph 2 * [A] 5,15 [I] 7-8,10,12,16; | [XI]US2002106684 (KOPRESKI MICHAEL S [US]) [X] 1-2,5,9-15,17-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0113] * [I] 7-8; | [XAI]WO0136601 (CHIRON SPA [IT]; ABRIGNANI SERGIO [IT]; PILERI PIERO [IT]) [X] 1-2,9-10 * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 20 * * page 7, line 12 - page 8, line 20 * [A] 5,15 [I] 7-8,11-12 | [XAI] - EL-HEFNAWY TALAL; RAJA SIVA; KELLY LORI; BIGBEE WILLIAM L; KIRKWOOD JOHN M; LUKETICH JAMES D; GODFREY TONY E, "Characterization of amplifiable, circulating RNA in plasma and its potential as a tool for cancer diagnostics.", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (20040112), vol. 50, no. 3, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 564 - 573, XP002543914 [X] 1-2,9-14,16-18 * abstract * * page 565, column 1 * [A] 5,15 [I] 7-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2003.028506 |