EP2299950 - OSTOMY APPLIANCES WITH SULFONATED POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConvaTec Technologies Inc. 3993 Howard Hughes Parkway Suite 250 Las Vegas, NV 89169-6754 / US | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMBASIVAM, Mahesh Convatec Inc. 200 Headquarters Park Drive Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London, EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/13] | Mays, Julie Barker Brettell LLP 10-12 Priests Bridge Barnes, Greater London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 09767842.9 | 19.06.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009US47984 | Priority number, date | US20080073979P | 19.06.2008 Original published format: US 73979 P | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009155533 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299950 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/443, A61L24/04 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
A61F5/443 (EP,US);
A61L24/04 (EP,US);
A61L24/046 (EP,US);
A61L24/06 (EP,US);
C08L5/00 (EP,US);
A61F5/445 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L24/046, C08L67/00 (US,EP);
A61L24/046, C08L75/04 (US,EP);
A61L24/046, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
A61L24/06, C08L25/04 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2011/13] | A61F5/443 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | OSTOMIE-VORRICHTUNGEN MIT SULFONIERTEN POLYMEREN | [2011/13] | English: | OSTOMY APPLIANCES WITH SULFONATED POLYMERS | [2011/13] | French: | ACCESSOIRE DE STOMIE AVEC POLYMÈRES SULFONÉS | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 27.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/25] | 10.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1557145 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [X] 1,3,5-8 * paragraph [0037] *; | [X]WO9853771 (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-8 * examples 14-16 *; | [XP]WO2008109747 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [XP] 1,5-8 * claims 3,5 * | International search | [X]US2007179461 (SAMBASIVAM MAHESH [US], et al); | [Y]US2008085972 (O'BRIEN EMMETT PATRICK [US], et al) |