EP2355721 - BONE SCREW PURCHASE AUGMENTATION IMPLANTS, SYSTEMS AND TECHNIQUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthes GmbH Eimattstrasse 3 4436 Oberdorf / CH | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALE, Shreedhar c/o Synthes Inc. 1302 Wrights Lane East West Chester PA 19380 / US | 02 /
CHIEN, Dennis 1780 Hunters Circle West Chester, PA 19380 / US | 03 /
DELURIO, Robert 2458 Weir Road Aston, PA 19014 / US | 04 /
COMPTON, Curtis 502 Thomas Road Downingtown, PA 19335 / US | [2011/38] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
KALE, Shreedhar 182 Whispering Pine Drive West Chester, PA 19380 / US | ||
02 /
CHIEN, Dennis 1780 Hunters Circle West Chester, PA 19380 / US | |||
03 /
DELURIO, Robert 2458 Weir Road Aston, PA 19014 / US | |||
04 /
COMPTON, Curtis 502 Thomas Road Downingtown, PA 19335 / US | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09767885.8 | 19.06.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009US48055 | Priority number, date | US20080073998 | 19.06.2008 Original published format: US 73998 | US20080106862 | 20.10.2008 Original published format: US 106862 | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009155577 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2355721 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/68, F16B13/00 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
A61B17/686 (EP,US);
A61B17/68 (KR);
A61B17/70 (KR);
A61B17/86 (KR);
A61F2/28 (KR);
F16B2013/009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/33] | Title | German: | IMPLANTATE, SYSTEME UND TECHNIKEN ZUM VERBESSERTEN GREIFEN VON KNOCHENSCHRAUBEN | [2011/33] | English: | BONE SCREW PURCHASE AUGMENTATION IMPLANTS, SYSTEMS AND TECHNIQUES | [2011/33] | French: | TECHNIQUES, SYSTÈMES ET IMPLANTS PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER LA PRISE D'UNE VIS À OS | [2011/33] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/10] | 04.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2007118131 (GOOCH HUBERT L [US]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1-6 * [A] 20-22,30-32; | [YA]US2006204544 (SUNWOO MOON HAE [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-19 * the whole document * [A] 20-22; | [A]WO2004105632 (POLYDENT MEDICAL DEVICES LTD [IL], et al) [A] 20 * figure 1b *; | [Y]US2006235410 (RALPH JAMES D [US], et al) [Y] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1127581 (MUSCULOSKELETAL TRANSPLANT [US]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [PA]US2008221624 (GOOCH HUBERT L [US]) [PA] 1-22,30-32 * the whole document * | Examination | US6025538 | by applicant | US2007118131 | US2006204544 | US2006235410 |