EP2345137 - ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE WITH HOMOPOLAR DOUBLE EXCITATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2017/35] |
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | ||
For all designated states CNRS (Centre National de La Recherche Scientifique) 3 rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LECRIVAIN, Michel 13 rue Villa VAC F-94200 Ivry / FR | 02 /
HLIOUI, Sami 23 rue Victor Carmignac F-94110 Arcueil / FR | 03 /
GABSI, Mohamed 46 Rue de Strasbourg F-94230 Cachan / FR | 04 /
CHABOT, Franck 12C, rue Charles Infroit F-92190 Meudon / FR | 05 /
MOYNOT, Victor 15 rue de le Verrerie F-92190 Meudon / FR | [2011/29] | Application number, filing date | 09768162.1 | 09.11.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009FR52152 | Priority number, date | FR20080057636 | 10.11.2008 Original published format: FR 0857636 | [2011/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010052439 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2345137 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02K21/20, H02K1/27, H02K21/24 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
H02K1/2746 (EP,US);
H02K21/20 (EP,US);
H02K2201/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/29] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE DREHMASCHINE MIT HOMOPOLARER DOPPELERREGUNG | [2011/29] | English: | ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE WITH HOMOPOLAR DOUBLE EXCITATION | [2011/29] | French: | MACHINE ELECTRIQUE TOURNANTE A DOUBLE EXCITATION DE TYPE HOMOPOLAIRE | [2011/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 04.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/14] | 26.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE2109569 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1 * page 2, line 1 - page 5, line 22; figure 3 * [A] 8,9; | [A]FR2786956 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [A] 1,4,7-9 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0142649 (ECOAIR CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,9 * page 5, line 6 - page 10, line 25; figures 1-3,2a *; | [A]EP1416617 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR], et al) [A] 1,4,7-9* the whole document *; | [X]JP2008228534 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9 * abstract * | by applicant | US5682073 | FR2846483 |