EP2303674 - BOTTLE AND HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Serpell, Steven Roy 8 Gordon St Bendigo 3550 / AU | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Blance, Stephen John, et al Pure Ideas Ltd Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM15 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Blance, Stephen John, et al Pure Ideas IP 33 Blagrave Street Reading, Berkshire RG1 1PW / GB | ||
Former [2011/14] | Coates, Ian Harold Pure Ideas LLP 20 Mandeville Road Hertford, Hertfordshire SG13 8JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 09768615.8 | 22.06.2009 | [2011/14] | WO2009AU00803 | Priority number, date | AU20080903169 | 23.06.2008 Original published format: AU 2008903169 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009155642 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2303674 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62J11/00, B65D1/02, B65D25/00 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
B65D1/0276 (EP,US);
B62J11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | FLASCHE UND HALTER | [2011/14] | English: | BOTTLE AND HOLDER | [2011/14] | French: | BOUTEILLE ET SUPPORT | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 23.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/20] | 11.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3107028 (DE ROBERTIS MAURICE P); | [A]US3533526 (ADELL ROBERT); | [X]FR2501144 (LIEBERT CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al); | [A]US4441638 (SHIMANO KEIZO [JP]); | [A]US4667881 (MICHELOTTI GUIDO [IT]); | [X]NL9101831 (TECH IND TACX B V); | [X]US5624064 (MCGEE JR JOHN W [US]) |