EP2297768 - ARRANGEMENT FOR COATING TAPE-SHAPED FILM SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Von Ardenne Anlagentechnik GmbH Plattleite 19/29 01324 Dresden / DE | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTTSMANN, Lutz Amselweg 8 01900 Grossroehrsdorf / DE | 02 /
PROEHL, Holger Neugersdorfer Strasse 13 01324 Dresden / DE | [2012/21] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
GOTTSMAN, Lutz Amselweg 8 01900 Grossroehrsdorf / DE | ||
02 /
PROEHL, Holger Neugersdorfer Strasse 13 01324 Dresden / DE | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2011/12] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 09768970.7 | 23.06.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009EP04515 | Priority number, date | DE20081029379 | 23.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008029379 | [2011/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009156121 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2297768 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2297768 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, C23C16/54, C23C14/56 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
C23C16/545 (EP,US);
C23C14/562 (EP,US);
H01J37/3277 (EP,US);
H01J2237/2001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM BESCHICHTEN BANDFÖRMIGER FOLIENSUBSTRATE | [2011/12] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR COATING TAPE-SHAPED FILM SUBSTRATES | [2011/12] | French: | ENSEMBLE POUR L'APPLICATION D'UN REVETEMENT SUR DES SUBSTRATS DE TYPE FEUILLES EN FORME DE BANDES | [2012/04] |
Former [2011/12] | ENSEMBLE POUR L'APPLICATION D'UN REVÊTEMENT SUR DES SUBSTRATS DE TYPE FEUILLES EN FORME DE BANDES | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 11.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2009 | CY | 08.08.2012 | CZ | 08.08.2012 | DK | 08.08.2012 | EE | 08.08.2012 | FI | 08.08.2012 | HR | 08.08.2012 | IT | 08.08.2012 | LT | 08.08.2012 | MC | 08.08.2012 | MK | 08.08.2012 | MT | 08.08.2012 | NL | 08.08.2012 | PL | 08.08.2012 | RO | 08.08.2012 | SE | 08.08.2012 | SI | 08.08.2012 | SK | 08.08.2012 | TR | 08.08.2012 | BG | 08.11.2012 | NO | 08.11.2012 | GR | 09.11.2012 | ES | 19.11.2012 | IS | 08.12.2012 | PT | 10.12.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 08.08.2012 | ||
MK | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 08.08.2012 | |
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 08.08.2012 | |
NO | 08.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0661760 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,8-16* page 6, paragraph l *; | [XI]US5589007 (FUJIOKA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * column 7, line 13 - line 47 * * column 15, line 28 - line 45 * * column 17, line 43 - line 52 * * column 19, line 11 - line 19 * * column 19, line 20 - line 38 * * figure - * [I] 5,9-16; | [A]WO0120054 (VOEST ALPINE IND ANLAGEN [AT], et al) [A] 1,8-16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03100111 (CHANGSHA LYRUN MATERIALS CO LT [CN], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |