17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
12.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
02.09.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
12.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
25.09.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] |
18.09.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.09.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.09.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.07.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.06.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] |
26.06.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] |
09.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.09.2014 |
First examination report |
|
09.09.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.09.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
10.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] |
09.03.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.03.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
04.03.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
14.02.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.01.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|