Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9383288 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2016 | B2 | US2015019170 | 15.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04641 | 26.06.2009 | US201414270246 | 05.05.2014 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | US200913000856 | 26.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8715216 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2014 | B2 | US2011112595 | 12.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04641 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | US200913000856 | 26.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9442036 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2016 | B2 | US2011106466 | 05.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US200913001314 | 26.06.2009 | WO2009EP04640 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11300474 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2022 | B2 | US2016356667 | 08.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04640 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | US201615240421 | 18.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5611942B | Global Dossier | 22.10.2014 | B2 | JP2011525398 | 22.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04641 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5529123B | Global Dossier | 25.06.2014 | B2 | JP2011525397 | 22.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04640 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3028725 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2018 | B1 | EP3028725 | 08.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09769023 | 26.06.2009 | WO2009EP04640 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2303356 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2016 | B1 | EP2303356 | 06.04.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04640 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2728875 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2017 | C | CA2728875 | 30.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04641 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2728871 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2017 | C | CA2728871 | 30.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04640 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009262505B | Global Dossier | 07.08.2014 | B2 | AU2009262505 | 30.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04641 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009262504B | Global Dossier | 11.09.2014 | B2 | AU2009262504 | 30.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04640 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2303357 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2015 | B1 | EP2303357 | 06.04.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04641 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102076368B | 03.09.2014 | B | CN102076368 | 25.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04641 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102076369B | 23.04.2014 | B | CN102076369 | 25.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04640 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103948979B | 16.06.2017 | B | CN103948979 | 30.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200980124259 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104189968B | 12.04.2017 | B | CN104189968 | 10.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200980124257 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA019772 | 30.06.2014 | B1 | EA201170089 | 30.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04640 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2558961T | 09.02.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04641 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2574636T | 21.06.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04640 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ590699 | 21.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04640 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2303356T | 29.07.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP09769023 | 26.06.2009 | WO2009EP04640 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2303357T | 29.04.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP04641 | 26.06.2009 | EP09769024 | 26.06.2009 | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009156175 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2010 | A3 | WO2009156175 | 30.12.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009156174 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2010 | A3 | WO2009156174 | 30.12.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101630887B | Global Dossier | 15.06.2016 | B1 | KR20110025986 | 14.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101628412B | Global Dossier | 08.06.2016 | B1 | KR20110028517 | 18.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5980836B | Global Dossier | 31.08.2016 | B2 | JP2014176735 | 25.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5805735B | Global Dossier | 04.11.2015 | B2 | JP2014061429 | 10.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0801517 | 26.06.2008 | US7577408 | 26.06.2008 |