Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2291953 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2016 | A4 | EP2291953 | 09.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14472608 | 24.06.2008 | WO2009IB05955 | 16.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102077526B | 12.11.2014 | B | CN102077526 | 25.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US14472608 | 24.06.2008 | WO2009IB05955 | 16.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009156809 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14472608 | 24.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8291052 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2012 | B2 | US2009319645 | 24.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14472608 | 24.06.2008 |