EP2291953 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR DISTRIBUTED INFORMATION MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLDYREV, Sergey Maustetehtaankatu 5B31 FIN-00990 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
BROWN, Ronald Venemestarintie 8 C 11 FIN-00980 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
PALIN, Arto Rantatie 39 FIN-37830 Viiala / FI | 04 /
TUUPOLA, Juha-Matti Mallastehtaankatu 9 FIN-33270 Tampere / FI | 05 /
LAPPETELAINEN, Antti Lukupuronrinne 1 M FIN-02200 Espoo / FI | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Tognetty, Virpi Maria Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department PO Box 407 00045 Nokia Group / FI | Application number, filing date | 09769622.3 | 16.06.2009 | [2011/10] | WO2009IB05955 | Priority number, date | US20080144726 | 24.06.2008 Original published format: US 144726 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009156809 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2291953 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, H04L12/24, H04L29/06 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
H04L67/1097 (EP,US);
H04L67/63 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/10] | H04L12/56, G06F17/30, H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT FÜR VERTEILTE INFORMATIONSVERWALTUNG | [2011/10] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR DISTRIBUTED INFORMATION MANAGEMENT | [2011/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR UNE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS RÉPARTIE | [2011/10] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 01.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/18] | 07.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005083848 (SHAO HUAI-RONG [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0012] - [0016] - [0018] , [0020] - [0033] - [0045] - [0056] *; | [X]US2008144527 (MARCONDES CESAR A C [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] - [0034] - [0039] * | International search | [A]US2004053645 (BRIGNONE CYRIL [FR], et al); | [A]US2005083848 (SHAO HUAI-RONG [US], et al); | [A]US7353294 (NUCCI ANTONIO [US], et al); | [AP]WO2008145808 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [AP]WO2009013385 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) |