EP2290435 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/09] | CONTROL DEVICE OF LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM | ||
[2019/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2019/21] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIOMI, Makoto c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2019/21] |
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
SHIOMI, Makoto c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/21] |
Former [2011/09] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09769934.2 | 13.03.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009JP54936 | Priority number, date | JP20080169424 | 27.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008169424 | [2011/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009157224 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2290435 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2290435 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/133, G09G3/20, G09G3/34, G09G3/36 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
G09G3/3426 (EP,US);
G09G3/3406 (US);
G09G2310/0232 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0233 (US);
G09G2320/0238 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0646 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0407 (EP,US);
G09G2360/16 (EP,US);
G09G3/3648 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/21] |
Former [2011/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG SOWIE AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM DAFÜR | [2019/20] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE, AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2019/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER LE DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2019/20] |
Former [2011/09] | STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG, FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG SOWIE PROGRAMM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM DAFÜR | ||
Former [2011/09] | CONTROL DEVICE OF LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM | ||
Former [2011/09] | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D UN DISPOSITIF D AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, DISPOSITIF D AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER LE DISPOSITIF D AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, PROGRAMME ET SUPPORT D ENREGISTREMENT | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2010 | Translation filed | 20.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 06.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2009 | AT | 22.05.2019 | CY | 22.05.2019 | CZ | 22.05.2019 | DK | 22.05.2019 | EE | 22.05.2019 | ES | 22.05.2019 | FI | 22.05.2019 | HR | 22.05.2019 | IT | 22.05.2019 | LT | 22.05.2019 | LV | 22.05.2019 | MC | 22.05.2019 | MK | 22.05.2019 | MT | 22.05.2019 | NL | 22.05.2019 | PL | 22.05.2019 | RO | 22.05.2019 | SE | 22.05.2019 | SI | 22.05.2019 | SK | 22.05.2019 | TR | 22.05.2019 | BG | 22.08.2019 | NO | 22.08.2019 | GR | 23.08.2019 | IS | 22.09.2019 | PT | 22.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 13.03.2009 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.03.2009 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5534940 (SATO MASAYORI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 5 - line 12; figures 1,2,8 * * column 7, line 28 - column 8, line 24 *; | [Y]US6710781 (SAITO SEIJI [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0064] - [0069]; figure 6 *; | [Y]EP1705636 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2008106641 (CHOU YU-PIN [TW]) [Y] 1-9* paragraphs [0001] - [0007]; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP1936600 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2003255915 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2004184937 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2004212503 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JP2007225871 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC); | [A]JP2007310319 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2008116554 (SHARP KK); | [AP]JP2008287118 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB); | [AP]JP2009031585 (TOSHIBA CORP) | by applicant | JP2005309338 | JP3766231B |