EP2292676 - POLYURETHANE FOAM FOR FLAME-LAMINATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inoac Corporation 13-4, Meieki-minami 2-chome Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 450-8691 / JP | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIO Fuminori c/o Anjo Plant INOAC CORPORATION 1-36, Imaike-cho 3-chome Anjo-shi Aichi 446-8504 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA Yasushi c/o Anjo Plant INOAC CORPORATION 1-36, Imaike-cho 3-chome Anjo-shi Aichi 446-8504 / JP | [2017/16] |
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
HORIO Fuminori c/o Anjo Plant INOAC CORPORATION 1-36, Imaike-cho 3-chome Anjo-shi Aichi 446-8504 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMADA Yasushi c/o Anjo Plant INOAC CORPORATION 1-36, Imaike-cho 3-chome Anjo-shi Aichi 446-8504 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2017/16] |
Former [2011/10] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09770160.1 | 23.06.2009 | [2011/10] | WO2009JP61421 | Priority number, date | JP20080166533 | 25.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008166533 | [2011/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009157450 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292676 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2292676 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/32, B60R13/02, C08G18/42, C08G18/24, C08G18/48, C08G18/63, C08G18/16, C08G18/20, // C08G101/00 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
C08G18/4837 (EP,US);
C08G18/165 (EP,US);
C08G18/18 (US);
C08G18/2027 (EP,US);
C08G18/246 (EP,US);
C08G18/4018 (EP,US);
C08G18/4072 (EP,US);
C08G18/4261 (EP,US);
C08G18/48 (US);
C08G18/632 (EP,US);
C08G2101/00 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0083 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/10] | C08G18/32, B60R13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/16] |
Former [2011/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POLYURETHANSCHAUM ALS FLAMMHEMMER | [2011/10] | English: | POLYURETHANE FOAM FOR FLAME-LAMINATING | [2011/10] | French: | MOUSSE DE POLYURÉTHANE POUR DOUBLAGE À LA FLAMME | [2011/10] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2010 | Translation filed | 15.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 26.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2009 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | DK | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | ES | 19.04.2017 | FI | 19.04.2017 | HR | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | LV | 19.04.2017 | MC | 19.04.2017 | MK | 19.04.2017 | NL | 19.04.2017 | PL | 19.04.2017 | PT | 19.04.2017 | RO | 19.04.2017 | SE | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | IE | 23.06.2017 | LU | 23.06.2017 | MT | 23.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | FR | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | NO | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 23.06.2009 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
MT | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.06.2009 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
MT | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.06.2009 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
MT | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.06.2009 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
MT | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
MT | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 23.06.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 19.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1834974 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [X] 1-7,9 * examples 1-9 * * claims 1-25 * * paragraph [0018] * [I] 8,10,11; | [A]EP0814106 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-9 * * Examples *; | [AD]JPH04266919 (INOUE MTP KK) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO2005054327 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007326971 (INOUE MTP KK); | [A]JPH02261818 (BAYER AG); | [A]JPH10324728 (AIR PROD & CHEM); | [A]JPH03106922 (DOW CHEMICAL CO) | by applicant | JP4630309B | JPH09151234 | JP2003252946 | JPH04266919 |