01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
14.06.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
06.07.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
02.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.06.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.06.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.06.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.02.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
03.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.10.2012 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
19.10.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
19.10.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
13.07.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
09.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.08.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] |
08.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
04.03.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
14.02.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.01.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|