EP2322950 - MILLIMETER WAVE IMAGE PICKUP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Masprodenkoh Kabushikikaisha 80 Johnoh Asada-cho Nisshin-shi, Aichi 470-0194 / JP | For all designated states Chuo Electronics Co., Ltd. 9-9 Motohongocho 1-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0051 / JP | For all designated states Tohoku University 1-1 Katahira 2-chome Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEMURA, Jun c/o MASPRODENKOH KABUSHIKIKAISHA 80 Jyono Asada-cho Nisshin-shi Aichi 470-0194 / JP | 02 /
TAKEDA, Masamune c/o MASPRODENKOH KABUSHIKIKAISHA 80 Jyono Asada-cho Nisshin-shi Aichi 470-0194 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI Junichi c/o MASPRODENKOH KABUSHIKIKAISHA 80 Jyono Asada-cho Nisshin-shi Aichi 470-0194 / JP | 04 /
HASEGAWA, Tsuyoshi c/o CHUO ELECTRONICS CO. LTD. 9-9 Motohongocho 1-chome Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0051 / JP | 05 /
HIRAI, Haruyuki c/o CHUO ELECTRONICS CO. LTD. 9-9 Motohongocho 1-chome Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0051 / JP | 06 /
NIIKURA, Hirotaka c/o CHUO ELECTRONICS CO. LTD. 9-9 Motohongocho 1-chome Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0051 / JP | 07 /
MATSUZAKI, Tomohiko c/o CHUO ELECTRONICS CO. LTD. 9-9 Motohongocho 1-chome Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0051 / JP | 08 /
SATO, Hiroyasu c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 1-1 Katahira 2-chome Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 09 /
SAWAYA, Kunio c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 1-1 Katahira 2-chome Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 10 /
MIZUNO, Koji c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 1-1 Katahira 2-chome Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Roth, Klaus Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg/Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Roth, Klaus Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Ravensburg / Berg / DE | ||
Former [2011/20] | Roth, Klaus Grosstobelerstrasse 39 88276 Ravensburg/Berg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09770261.7 | 26.06.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009JP61755 | Priority number, date | JP20080168863 | 27.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008168863 | [2011/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009157551 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2322950 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/89, G01V3/12, G06T7/00 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
G01S7/412 (EP,US);
G01S13/887 (EP,US);
G01S13/89 (EP,US);
G06V2201/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | MILLIMETERWELLEN-BILDAUFNAHMEANORDNUNG | [2011/20] | English: | MILLIMETER WAVE IMAGE PICKUP DEVICE | [2011/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE D'ONDES MILLIMÉTRIQUES | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2011 | Translation filed | 20.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 27.05.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2004085480 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JP2005351811 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2007256171 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH10282247 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH09197042 (YAMASHITA EIKICHI, et al); | [A]JP2003177175 (NEC CORP); | [AP]JP2008241352 (MASPRO DENKO KK) |