EP2318776 - SOLAR POWER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNETT, Mark, D. 103 Macoupin St. Benld IL 62009 / US | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/20] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2011/19] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 09770711.1 | 05.06.2009 | [2011/19] | WO2009US46454 | Priority number, date | US20080163703 | 27.06.2008 Original published format: US 163703 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009158177 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2318776 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2318776 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/18, F24J2/34, F24J2/12 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
F24S23/71 (EP,US);
F24S20/20 (EP,US);
F24S23/79 (EP,US);
F24S60/00 (EP,US);
Y02E10/40 (US);
Y02E10/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/19] | Title | German: | SOLARENERGIEVORRICHTUNG | [2011/19] | English: | SOLAR POWER DEVICE | [2011/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF À ÉNERGIE SOLAIRE | [2011/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 20.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2009 | AT | 15.05.2013 | BE | 15.05.2013 | CY | 15.05.2013 | CZ | 15.05.2013 | DK | 15.05.2013 | EE | 15.05.2013 | FI | 15.05.2013 | HR | 15.05.2013 | IT | 15.05.2013 | LT | 15.05.2013 | LV | 15.05.2013 | MC | 15.05.2013 | MK | 15.05.2013 | MT | 15.05.2013 | NL | 15.05.2013 | PL | 15.05.2013 | RO | 15.05.2013 | SE | 15.05.2013 | SI | 15.05.2013 | SK | 15.05.2013 | TR | 15.05.2013 | IE | 05.06.2013 | LU | 05.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | BG | 15.08.2013 | NO | 15.08.2013 | GR | 16.08.2013 | IS | 15.09.2013 | PT | 16.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MK | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
TR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
IE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
IE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
IE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4402306 (MCELROY JR ROBERT C [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7-16,18,21,24-28 * the whole document * [Y] 22,23; | [Y]US4586334 (NILSSON SR JACK E [US], et al) [Y] 22,23 * figure -; claims 1,8 *; | [X]US4068474 (DIMITROFF BORIS) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-11,15,16,18,19,21,24,25 * column 2, line 27 - line 68; figure - *; | [X]WO7901005 (SOLAR DYNAMICS LTD [US]) [X] 1-4,7-18,21,24-28 * page 5, line 30 - page 10, line 22; figure - * | by applicant | US4402306 | US4586334 |