EP2288673 - NOVEL TRANSALKYLATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uop LLC 25 East Algonquin Rd. P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLDINGH, Edwin, P. UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | 02 /
GATTER, Michael, G. UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL60017-5017 / US | 03 /
KOSTER, Susan, C. UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | 04 /
LAFYATIS, David, S. Uop Llc 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | 05 /
DEAK, Terrence, E. UOP-Riverside P. O. Box 163 Riverside, IL 60546-0163 / US | 06 /
BAKER, Eric, J. UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | 07 /
BROACH, Robert, W. UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | 08 /
JAN, Deng-Yang UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | 09 /
MOSCOSO, Jaime, G. UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/12] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2011/09] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 09770778.0 | 17.06.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009US47584 | Priority number, date | US20080146831 | 26.06.2008 Original published format: US 146831 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009158244 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2288673 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C10G45/46, B01J29/06 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
B01J29/80 (EP,US);
B01J29/26 (EP,US);
B01J29/70 (EP,US);
B01J29/72 (EP,US);
B01J29/78 (EP,US);
C07C6/126 (EP,US);
B01J2229/20 (EP,US);
B01J2229/42 (EP,US);
B01J29/48 (EP,US);
B01J37/0009 (EP,US);
C07C2529/70 (EP,US);
C07C2529/78 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C6/126, C07C15/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | NEUES TRANSALKYLIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2011/09] | English: | NOVEL TRANSALKYLATION PROCESS | [2011/09] | French: | NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSALKYLATION | [2011/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 08.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2015 | Observations by third parties | 07.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/29] | 19.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.07.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 30.07.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.08.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 15.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.02.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 24.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6419895 (LEWIS GREGORY J [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * see col. 5, lines 36-51 *; | [Y]US6500998 (JAN DENG-YANG [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * see col. 7 , lines 32-58 *; | [IY]US2004199036 (JAN DENG-YANG [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * see example 35 and table 33. * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]US6890511 (ROHDE LISA M [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * see col.10, lines 19-39 *; | [AP]US2008170987 (LEWIS GREGORY J [US], et al) [AP] 1-10* see [0022] * | International search | [A]US2004199036 (JAN DENG-YANG [US], et al); | [A]US2007149836 (CHANG YUN-FENG [US], et al); | [A]US2008041765 (LARSON ROBERT B [US], et al) | other | EP1447131 |