EP2376116 - ANTI-IGF ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2015/50] |
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAM, Paul Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Str. 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 02 /
BORGES, Eric Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Str. 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2015/50] |
Former [2011/42] | 01 /
ADAM, Paul Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Str. 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | ||
02 /
BORGES, Eric Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Str. 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/42] | Hammann, Heinz Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 09771361.4 | 11.12.2009 | [2015/50] | WO2009EP66894 | Priority number, date | EP20080171554 | 12.12.2008 Original published format: EP 08171554 | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010066868 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2376116 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2376116 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C07K16/22 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
C07K16/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/282 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
G01N33/57496 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] | Extension states | AL | 12.07.2011 | BA | 12.07.2011 | RS | 12.07.2011 | Title | German: | ANTI-IGF-ANTIKÖRPER | [2015/27] | English: | ANTI-IGF ANTIBODIES | [2011/42] | French: | ANTICORPS CONTRE IGF | [2015/30] |
Former [2011/42] | ANTI-GF-ANTIK?RPER | ||
Former [2011/42] | Anticorps contre IGF | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 12.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15197949.9 / EP3064219 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.07.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 09.12.2015 | [2016/38] |
Former [2016/27] | deleted | ||
Former [2016/25] | LV | 09.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0700994 (JAPAN CLINICAL LAB [JP]) [A] 1-48* table 1 *; | [I]EP1505075 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [I] 1-48 * paragraph [0179] - paragraph [0263] * * figures 1-17 *; | [I]WO2007070432 (AMGEN FREMONT INC [US], et al) [I] 1-48 * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0227] *; | [I]WO2007118214 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [I] 1-48 * paragraph [0209] - paragraph [0231] * * figures 1-9 *; | [XP]WO2008155387 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [XP] 19-23 * claims 1-44 * * figures 1-9 * * sequence 13 *; | [I] - MIYAMOTO SHIN'ICHI ET AL, "Blockade of paracrine supply of insulin-like growth factors using neutralizing antibodies suppresses the liver metastasis of human colorectal cancers", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20050501), vol. 11, no. 9, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 3494 - 3502, XP002414392 [I] 1-48 * figures 1-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-04-1701 | [I] - GOYA MASATO ET AL, "Growth inhibition of human prostate cancer cells in human adult bone implanted into nonobese diabetic/severe combined immunodeficient mice by a ligand-specific antibody to human insulin-like growth factors", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD.; US, (20040101), vol. 64, no. 17, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 6252 - 6258, XP002982679 [I] 1-48 * figures 1-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-04-0919 | [I] - MAÑES S ET AL, "Functional epitope mapping of insulin-like growth factor I (IGF-I) by anti-IGF-I monoclonal antibodies", ENDOCRINOLOGY, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19970301), vol. 138, no. 3, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 905 - 915, XP002436109 [I] 1-48 * figures 3,9 * * tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.138.3.905 | [I] - MANES S ET AL, "PHYSICAL MAPPING OF HUMAN INSULIN-LIKE GROWTH FACTOR-I USING SPECIFIC MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES", JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY, BRISTOL, GB, (19970101), vol. 154, no. 2, ISSN 0022-0795, pages 293 - 302, XP008063540 [I] 45-48 * figures 1-8; tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1677/joe.0.1540293 | [I] - CASCIERI M A ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF THE INSULIN-LIKE GROWTH FACTOR I (IGF I) EPITOPES RECOGNIZED BY MONOCLONAL AND POLYCLONAL ANTIBODIES TO IGF I", ENDOCRINOLOGY SOCIETY, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19900601), vol. 126, no. 6, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 2773 - 2777, XP008079505 [I] 45-48 * figures 1-5 * |