EP2365756 - USE OF A PUMPABLE FAT COMPOSITION IN THE PREPARATION OF FARINACEOUS DOUGH AND PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF SUCH FAT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sime Darby Malaysia Berhad 19th Floor, Wisma Sime Darby Jalan Raja Laut Kuala Lumpur, 50350 / MY | [2011/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAARDEKOOPER, Robert Hendrikus Rietgors 4 NL-2953 GA Alblasserdam / NL | 02 /
ZIEVERINK, Martinus Mathilda Pieter Hovenierstraat 35 NL-2613 RM Delft / NL | 03 /
DE RUITER, Gerhard Adriaan Boekweitveld 1 NL-5473 JE Heeswijk-Dinther / NL | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/38] | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09771792.0 | 16.12.2009 | [2018/45] | WO2009NL50771 | Priority number, date | MY20080005090 | 16.12.2008 Original published format: MY 0805090 | EP20090152890 | 16.02.2009 Original published format: EP 09152890 | [2011/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010071427 | Date: | 24.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2365756 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2365756 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A21D2/16, A23D9/02, A23D9/00, C11C3/10 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
A21D2/165 (EP);
A21D2/16 (EP);
A23D9/00 (EP);
A23D9/02 (EP);
C11C3/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/38] | A21D2/16, A23D9/00, C11C3/10, A23L1/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER PUMPFÄHIGEN FETTZUSAMMENSETZUNG BEI DER ZUBEREITUNG EINES MEHLTEIGS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DERARTIGEN FETTZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2011/38] | English: | USE OF A PUMPABLE FAT COMPOSITION IN THE PREPARATION OF FARINACEOUS DOUGH AND PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF SUCH FAT COMPOSITION | [2011/38] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE GRAISSE POUVANT ÊTRE POMPÉE DANS LA PRÉPARATION DE PÂTE FARINEUSE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE TELLE COMPOSITION DE GRAISSE | [2011/38] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 30.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2009 | AT | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | HR | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | MK | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | SM | 07.11.2018 | LU | 16.12.2018 | MT | 16.12.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | NO | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 16.12.2009 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
MT | 16.12.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
MT | 16.12.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
NO | 07.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XA]FR2570388 (GERSCHEL DANIEL [FR]) [X] 14-16 * examples 1-3,5,6 * * page 16, lines 17-21 * * claims 1-11 * [A] 1-13; | [XA]WO9614755 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 14-16 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 22 * * page 7, lines 22-30 * * page 8, lines 17,18 * * page 9, lines 29-35 * * page 10, line 32 - page 11, line 24 * * page 11, lines 31-33 * * page 13, line 35 - page 14, line 10 * * examples 13,17,22 * * claims 16-20 * [A] 1-13; | [X]WO9716978 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 14-16 * page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * tables I-III,VI ** claims 1,7 *; | [X]EP1057887 (DANISCO [DK]) [X] 1-2,9,11-13 * paragraphs [0023] - [0031] - [0034] , [0035] , [0041] - [0043] * * examples 1,2,4 * * claims 1-24 * * figure 1 *; | [XDI]US2005214435 (DESBOIS PASCAL [FR], et al) [XD] 1-3,9-13 * paragraphs [0024] , [0029] * * examples 1-3 * * claims 1-7,9,10,13-16 * [I] 4-6,8; | [X]WO2006014322 (CARGILL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-13 * page 8, line 4 - page 14, line 13 * * examples 1,3 * * table 4 * * claims 1-34,36,41,44-47,61,62 *; | [X]US2007286940 (HERZING ANTHONY GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11 * paragraphs [0016] - [0026] * * example 1 * * claims 1-18,20,21,23,25,26 *; | [X]WO2008150169 (UNIMILLS B V [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,7,9-14,16 * page 2, line 15 - page 6, line 23 * * example 3 * * claims 1-13 *; | [XP]WO2009012888 (LODERS CROKLAAN USA LLC [US], et al) [XP] 1,12-13 * page 2, line 15 - page 4, line 30 * * page 5, lines 7-10,25-29 * * page 6, lines 11-25 * * page 7, lines 1-17 * * example 1 * * claims 1-15,17-28 * | by applicant | US5436021 | US5718938 | US2005214435 | US2007028940 | US2007286940 | WO2008150169 | - JEUNG HEE LEE ET AL., J AMER OIL CHEM SOC, (2007), vol. 84, pages 211 - 217 |