EP2307778 - PLASTIC CLAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gmeilbauer, Engelbert Stocketweg 1 82229 Seefeld / DE | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Castell, Klaus, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann-Castell Oberstraße 135 52349 Düren / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Castell, Klaus, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann - Castell Gutenbergstrasse 12 52349 Düren / DE | ||
Former [2011/15] | Liermann - Castell Patentanwaltskanzlei Gutenbergstraße 12 52349 Düren / DE | Application number, filing date | 09772013.0 | 02.07.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009DE00926 | Priority number, date | DE20082008960U | 02.07.2008 Original published format: DE 202008008960 U | [2011/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010000243 | Date: | 07.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2307778 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/233, F16L33/035, B65D63/10, F16L3/137 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
F16L3/2336 (EP,US);
B65D63/1072 (EP,US);
F16L3/137 (EP,US);
F16L3/2334 (EP,US);
F16L33/035 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1498 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFSCHELLE | [2011/15] | English: | PLASTIC CLAMP | [2011/15] | French: | COLLIER DE SERRAGE EN PLASTIQUE | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]FR1196312 (FERNMELDEWERK BAD BLANKENBURG) [X] 3 * the whole document * [I] 4; | [XYI]US3009220 (SAMUEL FEIN) [X] 3 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 43; figures 1-4 * * column 3, lines 2-21 * [Y] 2 [I] 4; | [A]US6047448 (ARNOLD PHILLIP F [US]) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6119314 (FREED ANNA B [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-12 * * column 6, lines 16-41 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 36 * [Y] 2; | [Y]DE102004053863 (MICHELBACH LUDWIG [DE]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0054] , [0057] , [0064] - [0068] *; | [A]US7062820 (OESTREICH ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 2 * abstract ** column 3, lines 22-33; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE202008001384U (SEPTIMUS HANS [DE]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0013]; claim 1 * |